EP2826529 - Ski carrying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brunner, Winfried Furtwänglerstrasse 18 33604 Bielefeld / DE | For all designated states Mikulaschek, Nikolaus Paulinenstrasse 9a 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunner, Winfried Furtwänglerstrasse 18 33604 Bielefeld / DE | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14176430.8 | 10.07.2014 | [2015/04] | Priority number, date | DE201320103169U | 16.07.2013 Original published format: DE 202013103169 U | [2015/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826529 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A63C11/02 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
A63C11/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2015/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tragevorrichtung für Ski | [2015/04] | English: | Ski carrying device | [2015/04] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour ski | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4537436 (PFORTMILLER DONALD D [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 12 - column 2, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US5131707 (ZAZZARA ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 3, line 33 - page 3, line 42; figure 1 * * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 16 * [I] 3; | [X]DE202006012301U (ROSELL FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1,3-5 * figures 1,3; claims 3,4,7 *; | [XY]WO03041821 (GILLI RETO [CH]) [X] 1,5,7 * page 2, line 12 - page 2, line 15; figure 2; claim 2 * [Y] 6; | [X]US3768711 (WILKINSON C) [X] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 63 - page 1, line 63; figure 1 * * page 2, line 62 - page 2, line 62 *; | [Y]DE3234805 (LOEFFELHOLZ EBERHARD) [Y] 6 * figure 1 * |