EP2975018 - Method of nitrosation of phenol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Fine Chemicals Austria Nfg GmbH & Co KG St.-Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermsen, Petrus, Johannes P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | 02 /
Poechlauer, Peter P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jesper Römer DSM Intellectual Property Geleen Office P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14177418.2 | 17.07.2014 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2975018 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C201/00, C07C207/04, C07C231/02 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C07C201/00 (EP);
C07C231/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/00, C07C207/04 (EP);
C07C231/02, C07C233/25 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nitrosierung von Phenol | [2016/03] | English: | Method of nitrosation of phenol | [2016/03] | French: | Procédé de nitrosation de phénol | [2016/03] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]RU2129117 (AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO AZOT) [ID] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [I]US3770834 (PROSSER T) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0850915 (DAICEL CHEM [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 30 - line 34 * * column 5, line 31 - line 32; example 1 *; | [XDI]FR2533559 (BENZARIA JACQUES [FR]) [XD] 6,7 * the whole document * [I] 8-10; | [XDI]RU2461543 (FEDERAL NOE G AVTONOMNOE OBRAZOVATEL NOE UCHREZHDENIE VYSSHEGO PROFESSIONAL NOGO OBRAZOVANIJA URAL S [RU]) [XD] 6,7 * the whole document * [I] 8-10 | [A] - YENES S ET AL, "A study of the reaction of different phenol substrates with nitric oxide and peroxynitrite", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991203), vol. 55, no. 49, doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(99)00877-7, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 14111 - 14122, XP004585078 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(99)00877-7 | by applicant | RU2129117 | RU2127117 | RU2461543 | FR2533559 | - ORG.PROC.RES.DEV., (2011), vol. 15, page 912 |