EP2826726 - Base for supporting a waste container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastic Omnium Systèmes Urbains 19, boulevard Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2019/08] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Troton, Jean Moulin Favre 01800 Meximieux / FR | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [2015/04] | Application number, filing date | 14177518.9 | 17.07.2014 | [2015/04] | Priority number, date | FR20130057160 | 19.07.2013 Original published format: FR 1357160 | [2015/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826726 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/14, B65F1/12 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B65F1/141 (EP);
B65F1/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2015/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sockel zur Unterstützung eines Müllbehälters | [2015/04] | English: | Base for supporting a waste container | [2015/04] | French: | Socle destiné à supporter un conteneur de déchets | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 04.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.03.2019 | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2578519 (NETTOIEMENT STE NORMANDE [FR]) [A] 1-12,14,15 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 8 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3822014 (BERNHARD REILING GLAS-RECYCLING GMBH) [A] 1,8,11,15 * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 53 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2555146 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [A] 1,8,11,15 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2461664 (OHEIX MICHEL) [A] 1,8,11,15 * page 2, line 33 - page 6, line 40 * * figures 1-10 * |