EP2807995 - Apertured polymeric film webs and absorbant articles using such webs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Yann-Per Winton Hill Business Center 6083 Center Hill Ave Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45224 / US | 02 /
Fereshtehkhou, Saeed Becket Ridge Technical Center 8611 Becket Road West Chester, OH Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
Stone, Keith Joseph One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnitati, OH Ohio 45202 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2020/29] |
Former [2014/49] | Briatore, Andrea Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Dept. Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 14178002.3 | 06.04.2001 | [2014/49] | Priority number, date | US20000544886 | 07.04.2000 Original published format: US 544886 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807995 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2807995 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/00, B29C48/14, A61F13/512, A61F13/511, A61F13/15, B32B3/10, B26F1/26, A61F13/513, B26F1/10, B26F1/24 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/15203 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/15731 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/28 (US);
A61F13/5116 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/512 (EP,KR,US);
B26F1/10 (EP,KR,US);
B26F1/24 (EP,KR,US);
B26F1/26 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/0022 (EP,US);
B29C48/14 (EP,US);
B32B3/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/266 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/24 (US);
A61F2013/1543 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51165 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/51338 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/51366 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/4878 (US);
B32B2307/728 (US);
B32B2307/73 (US);
B32B2555/02 (US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | A61F13/15, A61F13/512, A61F13/511, B26F1/10, B26F1/24, B26F1/26, B32B3/10, A61F13/513 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mit Öffnungen versehene Polymerfilmbahnen und absorbierende Artikel mit solchen Bahnen | [2014/49] | English: | Apertured polymeric film webs and absorbant articles using such webs | [2014/49] | French: | Bandes de film polymère à ouvertures et articles absorbants utilisant de telles bandes | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01930453.4 / EP1267780 | EP05110224.2 / EP1621169 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | GB | 05.04.2021 | IE | 06.04.2021 | [2021/38] |
Former [2021/37] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 06.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4327730 (SORENSEN EUGENE R) [X] 1-5,7-15 * column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * column 4, line 1 - line 3 * * column 5, line 35 - line 40 * * column 6, line 11 - line 15 * * claim 1 * [A] 6; | [XD]US4609518 (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * figures 1-19 * * examples 1-3 *; | [XD]US4629643 (CURRO JOHN J [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * figure 7 * * column 11, line 28 - column 12, line 41 *; | [X]US4637819 (OUELLETTE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * example 1 * * figures 1-7 * * claims 23,25 *; | [X]US5733628 (PELKIE JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * column 1, lines 5-8 * * column 2, lines 30-55 ** claims 1-3,11 *; | [X]WO9930658 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * page 7, lines 1-30 * * page 13, line 1 - line 7 * * page 16, line 18 - page 19, line 27 * * figures 1-16 * * page 20, lines 14-27 *; | [X]US5997986 (TURI MORDECHAI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-15 * figures 1-28 * * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-11,23-28 *; | [XD]US6025049 (OUELLETTE WILLIAM R [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-15 * figure 2; claims 1-5 * | by applicant | US3566726 | US3929135 | US3967623 | US4107364 | US4152387 | US4197069 | US4324246 | US4342314 | US4463045 | US4533308 | US4609518 | US4629643 | US4634440 | US4637819 | US4681793 | US4695422 | US4778644 | US4780352 | US4798604 | US4834741 | US4839216 | US4846821 | US5006394 | US5143679 | US5156793 | US5167897 | EP0525676 | US5269981 | US5355579 | US5518801 | JPH08260329 | US5567736 | US5628097 | WO9731601 | US5670110 | WO9740793 | JPH10131014 | US5770144 | EP0858792 | WO9836721 | EP0861646 | EP0862904 | WO9842289 | WO9906623 | US5879494 | US5916661 | - "Penetration of Fabrics", EMERY I. VALKO, Chem. Aftertreat. Text., (1971), pages 83 - 113 | - Modern Plastics Encyclopedia Handbook, (1994), page 236 | US19990344161 |