EP2833071 - Methods for inspecting cooling holes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/06] | Methods and apparatus for inspecting cooling holes | ||
[2018/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. 1000 Marie-Victorin (01BE5) Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCaldon, Kian c/o Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. 1000 Marie Victorin (01BE5) Longueuil, Québec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2015/06] | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14178067.6 | 22.07.2014 | [2015/06] | Priority number, date | US201313957579 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: US201313957579 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2833071 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2833071 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2833071 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/06 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
F23R3/06 (EP,US);
G01M15/14 (US);
F01D25/00 (EP,US);
B23P2700/06 (EP,US);
F05D2230/72 (EP,US);
F05D2270/3062 (EP,US);
F05D2270/8041 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00019 (EP,US);
F23R2900/03041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2015/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Inspektion von Kühlöffnungen | [2018/47] | English: | Methods for inspecting cooling holes | [2018/47] | French: | Procédés d'inspection de trous de refroidissement | [2018/47] |
Former [2015/06] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Inspektion von Kühlöffnungen | ||
Former [2015/06] | Methods and apparatus for inspecting cooling holes | ||
Former [2015/06] | Procédés et appareil d'inspection de trous de refroidissement | Examination procedure | 24.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 25.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2014 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | ES | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | NL | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | IE | 22.07.2019 | LU | 22.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.07.2014 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.07.2014 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 22.07.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 22.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
ES | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NL | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE19749984 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 7,15 * abstract *[A] 1-6,8-14; | [XY]DE102010001485 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-14 * the whole document * [Y] 7,15; | [XY]WO2012133630 (IHI CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033]; figures 5a,5b * [Y] 7,15 | Examination | US5719341 | US2009016402 | US2009255332 | US2009297336 | US2011125423 | EP2466069 |