EP2840648 - Wireless IC device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Noboru c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Ikemoto, Nobuo c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/12] |
Former [2015/09] | 01 /
Kato, Noboru c/o Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
Ikemoto, Nobuo c/o Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2015/09] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 15 15 29 80049 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14178344.9 | 08.05.2009 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | JP20080133335 | 21.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008133335 | JP20080239826 | 18.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008239826 | [2015/09] | Previously filed application, date | WO2009JP58682 | 08.05.2009 | [2015/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840648 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2840648 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38, G06K19/07, G06K19/077, H01Q1/50, H01Q7/00, H05K1/02 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/0775 (US);
G06K19/0709 (US);
G06K19/0723 (US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,US);
G06K19/07781 (EP,US);
G06K19/07783 (EP,US);
G06K19/07784 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2225 (US);
H01Q1/48 (US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H05K1/0243 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2015/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drahtlose integrierte Schaltungsvorrichtung | [2015/09] | English: | Wireless IC device | [2015/09] | French: | Dispositif CI sans fil | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 14.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09750476.5 / EP2284949 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2009 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | IE | 08.05.2016 | LU | 08.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/45] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006044769 (FORSTER IAN J [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure 6 ** paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]JP2006203852 (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,12,22-26 *; | [A]WO2007138857 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0092]; figures 26,27 * | by applicant | WO2007083574 |