EP2835796 - Information processing apparatus, programmable display apparatus, data processing method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2015/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishihara, Hiromi OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Kawakami, Fumio OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14178673.1 | 28.07.2014 | [2015/07] | Priority number, date | JP20130166242 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013166242 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2835796 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2835796 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/26, G06F17/21, G06F17/22, G06F9/44, G06F17/30, G06T3/40, G06T11/60, G06F3/14, G09G5/22, G06F17/24 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,CN,US);
G06F40/103 (US);
G06F40/109 (EP,CN,US);
G06F40/166 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP,CN,US);
G06F9/454 (EP,CN,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,CN,US);
G09G5/22 (EP,CN,US);
G09G5/26 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/07] | G09G5/26, G06F17/21, G06F17/22, G06F9/44, G06F17/30, G06T3/40, G06T11/60, G06F3/14, G09G5/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, programmierbare Anzeigevorrichtung, Datenverarbeitungsverfahren und Programm | [2015/07] | English: | Information processing apparatus, programmable display apparatus, data processing method, and program | [2015/07] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'informations, appareil d'affichage programmable, procédé de traitement de données et programme | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.02.2018 | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/26] | 08.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US5212477 (INDEKEU JACK P [US], et al) [I] 1-4,9-16 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 5-8; | [IY]US2003048294 (ARNOLD JOHN E [US]) [I] 1-4,9-16 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 5-8; | [Y]US2011320938 (SCHORSCH BRENT [US]) [Y] 5-8* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-12 * | by applicant | JP2000194472 |