EP2833291 - Programmable display apparatus, control method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Kiyotaka OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Yamashita, Takayoshi OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
Kawakami, Fumio OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-Ku Kyoto, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14178674.9 | 28.07.2014 | [2015/06] | Priority number, date | JP20130156681 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013156681 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833291 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
G06V40/172 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/0861 (US);
G06F21/32 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Programmierbare Anzeigevorrichtung, Steuerungsverfahren und Programm | [2015/06] | English: | Programmable display apparatus, control method, and program | [2015/06] | French: | Appareil d'affichage programmable, procédé de commande et programme | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 23.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 14.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 11.04.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2008112222 (DIGITAL ELECTRONICS CORP)[AD] 1; | [XI] - Shihong Lao ET AL, "Vision-Based Face Understanding Technologies and Their Applications", Field Programmable Logic and Application, Berlin, Heidelberg, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (20040101), vol. 3338, pages 339 - 348, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-30548-4_39, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-54-045234-8, XP055146167 [X] 1-5 * §8.3-8.4, §2, Figure 7 * [I] 6-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-30548-4_39 | [X] - TILEN MLAKAR ET AL, "Viewer authentication for personalized iTV services", EIGHTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON IMAGE ANALYSIS FOR MULTIMEDIA INTERACTIVE SERVICES (WIAMIS '07), (20070601), doi:10.1109/WIAMIS.2007.88, ISBN 978-0-76-952818-2, pages 63 - 63, XP055146179 [X] 1 * Title * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WIAMIS.2007.88 | [I] - ELJKO OBRENOVIC ET AL, "Integrating User Customization and Authentication: The Identity Crisis", SECURITY & PRIVACY, IEEE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20120901), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1109/MSP.2012.119, ISSN 1540-7993, pages 82 - 85, XP011467287 [I] 1 * first three paragraphs * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2012.119 | by applicant | JP2004078687 | JP2008112222 | JP2008165353 | JP2011059194 |