EP2813664 - Apparatus and method for managed pressure drilling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transocean Sedco Forex Ventures Ltd. 4 Greenway Plaza Houston, TX 77046 / US | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozicz, John 24606 Northcrest Drive Spring, TX Texas 77389 / US | 02 /
Juran, Tim 13614 Bevken Court Cypress, TX Texas 77429 / US | 03 /
Legault, Andy 4 E. Greenway Plaza Houston, TX Texas 77046 / US | 04 /
Black, Sandy 10 Dura View Pitscottie Cupar, Scotland, XX KY15 5UN / GB | 05 /
Mackay, John 17 Rashieley Road Inverurie, Scotland, XX AB51 3YQ / GB | 06 /
Niven, Scott 13 St Ronan's Circle Peterculter Aberdeen, Scotland, XX AB14 ONE / GB | 07 /
Sneddon, Iain 3 Westpark Road Dundee, Scotland, XX DD2 1NU / GB | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 14178732.5 | 20.10.2006 | [2014/51] | Priority number, date | US20050728542P | 20.10.2005 Original published format: US 728542 P | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2813664 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2813664 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2813664 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/01, E21B21/08, E21B33/08 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
E21B17/01 (EP,NO,US);
E21B21/082 (EP,NO,US);
E21B33/085 (EP,NO,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Bohren mit verwaltetem Druck | [2014/51] | English: | Apparatus and method for managed pressure drilling | [2014/51] | French: | Appareil et procédé de forage sous pression contrôlée | [2014/51] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 21.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06826235.1 / EP1951986 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2006 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | PT | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | IE | 20.10.2018 | LU | 20.10.2018 | FR | 22.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | DE | 01.05.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.10.2006 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
FR | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PT | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
FR | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
FR | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
IE | 20.10.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
FR | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
FR | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
FR | 22.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
DE | 01.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
LU | 20.10.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6536540 (DE BOER LUC [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US6607042 (HOYER CAREL W J [CA], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005017308 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 2-5,7 * page 10, lines 9-17 * * page 11, lines 26-35 * * page 12, lines 24-30 * * page 14, lines 19-33 * * page 17, lines 6-18 *; | [IPY]US7090036 (DEBOER LUC [US]) [IP] 1,6 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 49; figure 9a; claim 1 * * column 10, line 43 - line 51 * [Y] 2-5,7 | Examination | US2004060737 | by applicant | US5662181 | US6263982 | US6273193 |