EP2980515 - Sinter cooler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL WURTH S.A. 32 rue d'Alsace 1122 Luxembourg / LU | For all designated states Paul Wurth Umwelttechnik GmbH Grugaplatz 4 45131 Essen / DE | For all designated states Paul Wurth IHI Co. Ltd Toyosu IHI Building 1-1 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greiveldinger, Bob 4, Parc Lésigny 5753 Frisange / LU | 02 /
Nowak, Manfred Forellstr. 9 45663 Recklinghausen / DE | 03 /
Kramer, Daniel Bergmannsglück 6 45327 Essen / DE | 04 /
Weissert, Thilo Waldesrand 42 44879 Bochum / DE | 05 /
Kassebaum, Holger Apfelbaumweg 4 44143 Dortmund / DE | 06 /
Hosoma, Shingo Clio Shonan Taura Sanbankan-1208 16-21, Funakoshi-cho 6-chome Yokosuka, Kanagawa 237-0076 / JP | 07 /
Kubo, Yasuo Edifficio Narimasu-305, 6-18 Narimasu 1-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo, 175-0094 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14178804.2 | 28.07.2014 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980515 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F27D15/02 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
F27D15/0286 (EP,KR,RU);
C22B1/26 (RU);
F27D2015/0293 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sinterkühler | [2016/05] | English: | Sinter cooler | [2016/05] | French: | Refroidisseur de frittage | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3578297 (NIEMS LEE H); | [Y]US3837792 (DEUSSNER H); | [A]GB2005388 (DESSAU ZEMENTANLAGENBAU VEB); | [A]US4728288 (NIEMS LEE H [US]); | [Y]CN203259017U (CITIC HEAVY IND CO LTD, et al); | [E]EP2593740 (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT]) |