EP2833174 - Optical fiber and optical transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2015/14] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshinori c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku YOKOHAMA-SHI, KANAGAWA / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Masaaki c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho Sakae-ku YOKOHAMA-SHI, KANAGAWA / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 14178936.2 | 29.07.2014 | [2015/06] | Priority number, date | JP20130156476 | 29.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013156476 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833174 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, // G02B6/036, H04B10/2507 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
G02B6/02276 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/0228 (US);
G02B6/02042 (US);
G02B6/03633 (EP,CN,US);
H04B10/2507 (CN);
H04B10/2525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2015/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Glasfaser und optisches Übertragungssystem | [2015/06] | English: | Optical fiber and optical transmission system | [2015/06] | French: | Fibre optique et système de transmission optique | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07230015 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] , [0018] *; | [XI]US2003147610 (TSUKITANI MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0075]; figure 11; table 2 * [I] 3,4; | [X]US2004114897 (KOSHIBA MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0020] , [0074] - [0085] - [0097] , [0098]; figures 2,3,7 *; | [X]EP2352047 (DRAKA COMTEQ BV [NL]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * | by applicant | - JOHN A. JAY, "Low Signal Latency in Optical Fiber Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 60TH IWCS CONFERENCE, pages 429 - 437 |