EP2800187 - ELECTROCHEMICAL SYSTEM COMPRISING A FLUID MANIFOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/45] | Electrocheminal system comprising a fluid manifold | ||
[2017/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough LE11 3GB / GB | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/45] | For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92611 Clichy Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrooten, Jeremy 517 East Silver Pines Court Colbert, Washington 99005 / US | 02 /
Sobejko, Paul 11 Great Oak Farm Road Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US | 03 /
Zimmermann, Joerg 3585 Hull St. Vancouver, British Columbia V5N 4R8 / CA | [2015/14] |
Former [2015/07] | 01 /
Schrooten, Jeremy 8653 Henderson Street Mission, British Columbia V2V 7P9 / CA | ||
02 /
Sobejko, Paul 11 Great Oak Farm Road Monroe, Connecticut 06468 / US | |||
03 /
Zimmermann, Joerg 3585 Hull St. Vancouver, British Columbia V5N 4R8 / CA | |||
Former [2014/45] | 01 /
Schrooten, Jeremy 8653 Henderson Street Mission, British Columbia V2V 7P9 / CA | ||
02 /
Sobejko, Paul 515 East 2nd Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 1E1 / CA | |||
03 /
Zimmermann, Joerg 1702 - 1616 Pendrell Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6G 1S8 / CA | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2017/51] |
Former [2014/45] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14179007.1 | 20.03.2008 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | US20070919472P | 21.03.2007 Original published format: US 919472 P | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2800187 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2800187 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800187 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04082, H01M8/0258, H01M8/2485, H01M8/0271 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
F15C1/06 (KR);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/026 (US);
H01M8/0271 (US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/2483 (EP,US);
H01M8/2485 (EP);
H01M2250/30 (US);
Y02B90/10 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/45] | H01M8/04, H01M8/02, H01M8/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2014/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHES SYSTEM UMFASSEND EINEN FLÜSSIGKEITSVERTEILER | [2017/41] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL SYSTEM COMPRISING A FLUID MANIFOLD | [2017/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE COMPRENANT UN COLLECTEUR DE FLUIDE | [2017/41] |
Former [2014/45] | Elektrochemisches system umfassend einen Flüssigkeitsverteiler | ||
Former [2014/45] | Electrocheminal system comprising a fluid manifold | ||
Former [2014/45] | Système électrochimique comprenant un collecteur de fluide | Examination procedure | 11.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08733645.9 / EP2158426 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2008 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | IE | 20.03.2018 | LU | 20.03.2018 | MT | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
MT | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
MT | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004062965 (MORSE JEFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0013] - [0035]; figures 3A-3L; claim 20 * [Y] 13; | [Y]US2006269821 (NAKAGAWA KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0129] *; | [E]EP2124281 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-7,9,10,12,14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0032]; figures 1,3,5 * | by applicant | US2006141328 | WO2004034485 | US20060379970 | US20060473591 |