EP2980363 - Machine and a method for operating the machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krützfeldt, Joachim Merziger Str. 18 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Oliver, Dr. Mozartstr. 36 46487 Wesel / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14179077.4 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2980363 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/04, F16J15/40, F01D25/18 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
F01D11/04 (EP,CN,US);
F01D11/06 (US);
F01D25/166 (US);
F01D25/18 (EP,CN,US);
F01D25/186 (US);
F02C7/06 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Maschine und Verfahren zum Betreiben der Maschine | [2016/05] | English: | Machine and a method for operating the machine | [2016/05] | French: | Machine et procédé de fonctionnement de la machine | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2167141 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XI]DE4420973 (ABB MANAGEMENT AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * column 2 - column 3; claims 1-3 * [I] 3,5; | [XI]US2012201661 (PANDEY VISHWAS KUMAR [IN], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033]; figures 1, 3, 5,7,8; claims 1-8 * [I] 3,5 |