EP2833363 - A creation system for producing synchronised soundtracks for electronic media content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Booktrack Holdings Limited 28-32 Anzac Street, Level 1 Takapuna Auckland 0622 / NZ | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cameron, Paul Charles 2/17 Commodore Parry Road Milford 0620 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
Cameron, Mark Steven 38A Ground Floor Coastline Villa Discovery Bay Hong Kong / HK | 03 /
Wilson, Craig Andrew 607A Beach Road Rothesay Bay 0630 Auckland / NZ | 04 /
Buer, Mark Anthony 4 Totara Street Glenholme 3010 Rotorua / NZ | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14179268.9 | 31.07.2014 | [2015/06] | Priority number, date | US201361861105P | 01.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361861105 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833363 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B27/34 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G06F40/169 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schöpfungssystem zur Herstellung synchronisierter Tonspuren elektronischer Medieninhalte | [2015/06] | English: | A creation system for producing synchronised soundtracks for electronic media content | [2015/06] | French: | Système de création de pistes acoustiques synchronisées pour produire un contenu multimédia électronique | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 10.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2312081 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * "Audio only clips may be linked to the text in a similar manner."; page 24, line 19 - line 20 * * GUI; page 19; figure 3 * * page 20 - page 26 * * page 27 - page 35 *; | [A]US2002054073 (YUEN HENRY C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0015] - [0019] *; | [I]US2006149781 (BLANKINSHIP ERIK J [US]) [I] 1-15 * GUI; paragraphs [0065] - [0067]; figure 9 * * used for editing; paragraphs [0043] , [0 44] , [0047] - [0050] *; | [A]US2008002949 (TOKUNAKA JUNZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010002275 (ISOUNDTRACK LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 21-31; figures 6-15 *; | [A]US2010318362 (KURZWEIL RAYMOND C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012210221 (KHAN ITRAT U [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2013015694 (BOOKTRACK HOLDINGS LTD [NZ], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2013015694 |