EP2843643 - Driver information system for providing information to the driver of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogel, Andreas Schenkenbruehl 7 31139 Hildesheim / DE | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 14179838.9 | 05.08.2014 | [2015/10] | Priority number, date | DE201310217531 | 03.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013217531 | [2015/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843643 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2843643 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0962 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
G08G1/09623 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2015/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fahrerinformationssystem zur Ausgabe von Hinweisen an einen Fahrzeugführer | [2015/10] | English: | Driver information system for providing information to the driver of a vehicle | [2015/10] | French: | Système d'informations du conducteur destiné à notifier des messages au conducteur de véhicule | [2015/10] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 19.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2014 | AL | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | MT | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | IE | 05.08.2016 | LU | 05.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 05.08.2014 | |
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102010039634 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] * [I] 4; | [I]DE102011081456 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]DE102008010968 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE102011081456 |