EP2853874 - Device for measuring at least one property of a fluid medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ott, Marcell Rabenweg 2 89278 Nersingen / DE | 02 /
Fessele, Thomas Danziger Str. 17 72202 Nagold / DE | [2015/14] | Application number, filing date | 14179956.9 | 06.08.2014 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | DE201310218479 | 16.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013218479 | [2015/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2853874 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2853874 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/06, G01L19/00 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
G01L19/0609 (EP);
G01L19/0092 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2015/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erfassung mindestens einer Eigenschaft eines fluiden Mediums | [2015/14] | English: | Device for measuring at least one property of a fluid medium | [2015/14] | French: | Dispositif destiné à déterminer au moins une propriété d'un milieu liquide | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2018 | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/24] | 30.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6003379 (ICHIKAWA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 13 * * figures 1-9 * [I] 6,7; | [A]FR2846416 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1 - page 14 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2730055 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1 - page 7 * * figures 1-4 *; | [IA]DE102004025339 (IFM ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 1 - page 5 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-10; | [A]FR2895076 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1 - page 9 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE10232315 (TEMPERATURMESTECHNIK GERABERG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 5 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE10137327 (HONSBERG & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 8 * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE102006051192 | WO2004042338 | US8117920 | - Konrad Reif: Sensoren im Kraftfahrzeug, (2012), pages 134 - 136 |