EP2987515 - Centrifuge and method of centrifuging a blood sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reapplix APS Blokken 45 3460 Birkerød / DK | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lundquist, Rasmus Stubbevangen 27 2700 Brønshøj / DK | 02 /
Holm, Niels Erik Julmosevej 10B 3460 Birkerød 3460 Birkerød / DK | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Chas. Hude A/S Langebrogade 3B 1411 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 14181377.4 | 19.08.2014 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2987515 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, B04B5/04, B04B13/00 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
B04B5/0421 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M1/0272 (CN,KR);
A61M1/0281 (KR);
A61M1/3693 (EP,KR,US);
A61P7/00 (EP,KR);
B04B13/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zentrifuge und Verfahren zum Zentrifugieren einer Blutprobe | [2016/08] | English: | Centrifuge and method of centrifuging a blood sample | [2016/08] | French: | Centrifugeuse et méthode de centrifugation d'un échantillon sanguin | [2016/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 04.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4766083 (MIYASHITA YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * column 7, line 13 - line 24; figure 7 * [A] 11-15; | [XA]US4777141 (CALZI CLAUDIO [IT], et al) [X] 11,15 * the whole document * * column 3, line 11 - line 43; figure 1 * * column 4, line 53 - line 57 * * column 5, line 15 - line 23 * [A] 1-10; | [Y]WO0132289 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 19, line 1 - page 20, line 3; figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 22 - line 23 *; | [XA]WO2007001754 (GAMBRO INC [US], et al) [X] 11-14 * the whole document * * page 28 - page 29; figures 1, 2, 4, 5, 8 * [A] 1-10; | [A]WO2008121120 (THERMOGENESIS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document ** pages 24, 34; figures 5, 17, 20 *; | [XA]WO2008140561 (GAMBRO BCT INC [US], et al) [X] 11-15 * the whole document * * pages 10, 13; figures 2-4 * [A] 1-10; | [YD]WO2010020254 (REAPPLIX APS [DK], et al) [YD] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 7; example 2 *; | [XA]WO2011071773 (CARIDIANBCT INC [US], et al) [X] 11 * the whole document * * page 7 - page 9; figure 1 * [A] 1-10; | [XA]WO2013048984 (FENWAL INC [US]) [X] 11,15 * the whole document * * page 17, line 10 - line 14; figures 5, 13 * [A] 1-10 | by applicant | WO2010020254 | WO2012037942 |