EP2840033 - Foldable box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schack, Line Sandmosevej 46 8720 Højbjerg / DK | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Tellefsen, Jens J. Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Tellefsen, Jens J. Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 14181774.2 | 21.08.2014 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | DK20130070457 | 21.08.2013 Original published format: DK 201370457 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840033 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/66, B65D1/22, B65D5/24, B65D5/20, B65D5/36, B65D5/42 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
B65D5/3657 (EP);
B65D1/225 (EP);
B65D5/2023 (EP);
B65D5/4283 (EP);
B65D5/6667 (EP);
B65D2301/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Faltschachtel | [2015/09] | English: | Foldable box | [2015/09] | French: | Boîte pliable | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 26.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19640541 (REICHENECKER HANS STOROPACK [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * column 4, line 17 - line 63; figures 3, 4 * [Y] 9; | [XY]US4136816 (GARDNER JEFFREY M) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 26; figure - * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]US3655114 (TURNER DAVID) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 20 - line 25; figure 7 *; | [Y]FR2706417 (SCA EMBALLAGE FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 10 * page 5, line 7 - line 27; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO2012176279 (KABUSHIKIKAISHA GREENPACKS [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * figure - * |