EP2826978 - A two-stroke internal combustion engine, method operating a two-stroke internal combustion engine and method of converting a two-stroke engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Schweiz AG Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nylund, Ingemar Rönnviksvägen 191 66580 Kuni / FI | 02 /
Ott, Marcel Emil-Klöti-Strasse 41 8406 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Sillanpää, Hannu c/o Wärtsilä Finland Oy/WSSC Box 394 65101 Vaasa / FI | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 14182313.8 | 08.07.2011 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826978 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02B7/06, F02B19/10, F02B19/12, F02B19/14, F02B25/04 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
F02B7/06 (EP);
F02B19/108 (EP);
F02B19/1095 (EP);
F02B19/12 (EP);
F02B19/14 (EP);
F02B25/04 (EP);
F02B43/10 (EP);
F02B2075/025 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2015/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine, Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine und Verfahren zur Umwandlung eines Zweitaktmotors | [2015/04] | English: | A two-stroke internal combustion engine, method operating a two-stroke internal combustion engine and method of converting a two-stroke engine | [2015/04] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne à deux temps, procédé de fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne à deux temps et procédé de conversion d'un moteur à deux temps | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 09.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11770825.5 / EP2729682 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2658487 (ITURBE BASABE NICOLAS) [A] 1* column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 19; figure 2 *; | [A]US4966103 (SCHAUB FREDERICK S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 64; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0397521 (ISUZU CERAMICS RES INST [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]US5035206 (WELCH ALAN B [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [E]EP2634398 (IHI CORP [JP]) [E] 1-10 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0080]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | US5035206 |