EP2858334 - NFC-capable holder for mobile communications device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klassen, Gerhard Dietrich c/o BlackBerry Sweden AB Torggatan 2 Magnus Stenbock 2 21140 Malmö / SE | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Patel, Binesh Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14182418.5 | 27.08.2014 | [2015/15] | Priority number, date | US201314045263 | 03.10.2013 Original published format: US201314045263 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858334 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/04, H04M1/725 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
H04M1/04 (EP,US);
H04B5/77 (US);
H04M1/0256 (US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Nahfeldkommunikationsfähiger Halter für Mobilkommunikationsvorrichtung | [2015/15] | English: | NFC-capable holder for mobile communications device | [2015/15] | French: | Support compatible NFC pour dispositif de communication mobile | [2015/15] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2302881 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0072] *; | [X]EP2533506 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP2613402 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0050] * |