EP2863662 - Multi-tier service wireless communications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poltorak, Alexander 128 W. Maple Avenue Monsey, NY 10952 / US | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14183154.5 | 29.04.2009 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | US20080125971P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 125971 P | US20090166344P | 03.04.2009 Original published format: US 166344 P | US20090167580P | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 167580 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2863662 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2863662 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/24, H04W72/04 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04W28/0268 (US);
H04L63/12 (US);
H04M15/42 (EP,US);
H04M15/43 (EP,US);
H04M15/80 (EP,US);
H04M15/8011 (EP,US);
H04M15/8016 (EP,US);
H04W12/00 (US);
H04W12/033 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W28/24 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04M2215/74 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7407 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7414 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (US);
H04W28/20 (EP,US);
H04W28/22 (EP,US);
H04W52/265 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drahtloses Kommunikationsnetzwerk mit mehrschichtigen Diensten | [2015/17] | English: | Multi-tier service wireless communications network | [2015/17] | French: | Réseau de communication sans fil à service multiniveau | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09816543.4 / EP2286550 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006120321 (GERKIS ANTHONY [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2006127339 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) |