EP2992950 - Method for producing aqueous emulsions or suspensions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wesner, John c/o The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza; Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
Fey, Oliver c/o Procter & Gamble Manufacturing GmbH Wellastr. 2-4 36088 Huenfeld / DE | 03 /
Mccall, Patrick c/o Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Str. 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Ruszkowski, Stephen Procter and Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitehall Lane, Egham Egham, Surrey TW20 9 NW / GB | 05 /
Barton, James c/o Barton Consult Puengelerstraße 1 52074 Aachen / DE | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 14183319.4 | 03.09.2014 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2992950 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/06, B01J19/00, B01F11/02, B01F15/02, B01F3/08, B01F3/12 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
B01F23/4111 (EP);
B01F23/41 (EP);
B01F23/482 (EP);
B01F23/49 (EP);
B01F25/4521 (EP);
B01F31/81 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2016/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung wässriger Emulsionen oder Suspensionen | [2016/10] | English: | Method for producing aqueous emulsions or suspensions | [2016/10] | French: | Procédé de production d'émulsions ou de suspensions aqueuses | [2016/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011172137 (COROMINAS FRANCESC [BE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13-16,18-20,26 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0064] , [0100] , [0101] , [0106] * [I] 5,7,12,17; | [XI]US2004249105 (NOLTE HANS-JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13-15,18-20,26 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] - [0054] * [I] 5,7,8,12,17; | [XI]US2004209963 (SCHAFFNER DAVID [CH]) [X] 1-4,6,9,10,13-15,18-20,26 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] * [I] 5,7,8,12,17; | [XI]US4996004 (BUECHELER MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8-12 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, lines 22-37 * [I] 7,17; | [A]US6390115 (ROHWER EGMONT [ZA], et al) [A] 1,18 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 2 *; | [A]EP0958853 (MARELLI ERNESTO [IT]) [A] 1,18 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0055] , [0063] , [0064] , [0069] * | by applicant | WO9513787 | US6479041 | US8517595 | US3399031 | US4675194 | US5026167 | US5837272 | - SOFW-JOURNAL, (199805), vol. 124, pages 308 - 313 | - SOFW-JOURNAL, (199205), vol. 118, pages 287 - 296 | - "Surfactants", International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, vol. 2 |