EP2851190 - Hydrogen transfer tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanil Tube Corporation 689-3, Kyoung Seo-Dong Seo-Ku Incheon 404-722 / KR | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choo, Albert (Seong-Hwa) 415-1106 Tae Pyeong Apt. Gyesan 3-dong 407-053 Incheon / KR | 02 /
Na, Byeong-Rok 103-1201 Poonglim Apt. Song Lim-dong Dong gu 401-732 Incheon / KR | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Rohmann, Michael Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2020/21] |
Former [2015/13] | Rohmann, Michael Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14183560.3 | 04.09.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | KR20130113255 | 24.09.2013 Original published format: KR 20130113255 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851190 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851190 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/08, B32B27/08, B32B27/34, B32B27/40, F16L11/04, F16L9/12 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
F16L9/123 (EP,US);
F16L11/12 (KR);
F16L11/045 (CN);
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
F16L11/04 (EP,US);
F16L9/133 (KR);
F16L9/14 (KR);
B32B2274/00 (EP,US);
B32B2597/00 (EP,US);
F16L2011/047 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | B32B1/08, B32B27/08, B32B27/34, B32B27/40, F16L11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wasserstoffübertragungsrohr | [2015/13] | English: | Hydrogen transfer tube | [2015/13] | French: | Tube de transfert d'hydrogène | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 22.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.11.2019 | 14.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2014 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | IT | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | GB | 04.09.2020 | IE | 04.09.2020 | LU | 04.09.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.09.2014 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
TR | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
GB | 04.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
GB | 04.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004069361 (CHENG CYRIELLE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0012] , [0013] , [0016] - [0019]; figure 1; claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]US2006124190 (CHENG CYRIELLE [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US2011005735 (ADLER ROBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0017]; claim - *; | [X]US2013186469 (BOURGEOIS PHILIP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0007]; figure -; claims 1,11,17,18,30,31,33,34,61,62 * | Examination | EP0637509 | US2004134555 | WO2014028700 |