EP2848457 - Methods and systems for electric vehicle charging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proterra Inc 1 Whitlee Ct. Greenville, SC 29607 / US | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarkar Reuben 31 Station Court, Apt. 401 Greenville South Carolina 29601 / US | 02 /
Gottschalk Marc 260 Dedalera Drive Potomac Valley California 94028 / US | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14184402.7 | 11.09.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | US201361876698P | 11.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361876698 P | [2015/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2848457 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2848457 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/53 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/55 (EP,US);
B60L53/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zum Laden eines elektrischen Fahrzeugs | [2015/12] | English: | Methods and systems for electric vehicle charging | [2015/12] | French: | Procédés et systèmes de chargement d'un véhicule électrique | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 15.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008067974 (ZHANG JIANHUA [CN], et al); | [X]JP2008141925 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]US2012249065 (BISSONETTE MICHAEL [US], et al); | [X]US2012316717 (DAUM WOLFGANG [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2010132443 | WO2011139675 | WO2012040369 | US2013057211 | US2013193918 |