EP2848340 - Cutting tool, in particular drill or milling cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jakob Lach GmbH & Co. KG Donaustrasse 17 63452 Hanau / DE | [2015/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maurer, Eugen Adam-Geck-Straße 10 61239 Ober-Mörlen / DE | [2015/12] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/12] | Application number, filing date | 14184457.1 | 11.09.2014 | [2015/12] | Priority number, date | DE201310110123 | 13.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013110123 | DE201310114792 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013114792 | [2015/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2848340 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04, B23B51/06, B23C5/28 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B23B51/06 (EP,US);
B23B51/042 (EP,US);
B23C5/06 (US);
B23C5/28 (EP,US);
B23B2226/31 (EP,US);
B23B2250/12 (US);
B23B2251/02 (EP,US);
B23B2251/50 (EP,US);
B23C2210/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2015/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zerspanungswerkzeug, insbesondere Bohr- oder Fräswerkzeug | [2015/12] | English: | Cutting tool, in particular drill or milling cutter | [2015/12] | French: | Outil d'enlèvement de copeaux, en particulier outil de fraisage ou de forage | [2015/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO0149448 (MAUEL VOLKMAR [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9 * page 8, line 1 - line 14; figure 4; claims 1-5,9 * [A] 13-17 [Y] 8,10,11 [I] 3-5,12; | [XI]DE202013101070U (KARL KEPPLER MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure - * [I] 15-17; | [XA]EP1525937 (ISHIHARA KIKAI KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0066]; figure - * [A] 13; | [YA]US5829926 (KAMMERMEIER DIRK [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 3, line 15 - line 34 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 17; figure - * [A] 1-4,7,8,13-17; | [A]US2012082518 (WOODRUFF DOUGLAS J [US], et al) [A] 1,8,9,12-17 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044]; figures 5,6 *; | [YA]US2005196244 (TAKIGUCHI SYOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,3,4,6; | [A]JPH01321105 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [A] 1,2,5,13-17 * abstract *; | [A]DE19937315 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]) [A] 3,4 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004032093 (CONCEPT LASER GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5947660 (KARLSSON RONNY [SE], et al) [Y] 10 * figure 8 * | by applicant | WO9529030 |