EP2821432 - POLYPHASE BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE POLYMER OF VEGETABLE ORIGIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/02] | Polyphase biodegradable compositions containing at least one polymer of vegetable origin | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVAMONT S.p.A. Via G. Fauser, 8 28100 Novara / IT | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capuzzi, Luigi Via Della Noce, 63 I-28100 Novara / IT | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Zanoli, Enrico, et al Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 14184559.4 | 05.08.2011 | [2015/02] | Priority number, date | IT2010MI01525 | 06.08.2010 Original published format: IT MI20101525 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821432 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2821432 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08L3/02, C08K5/06, C08L67/00, C08L67/03, B65D65/46, C08J5/18 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C08L3/02 (EP,KR,US);
B65D65/46 (KR);
B65D65/466 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08K5/06 (EP,US);
C08L101/16 (KR);
C08L67/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/03 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2403/02 (EP,US);
C08K2201/014 (EP,US);
C08L2201/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
Y02W90/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/06, C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L3/02, C08L2666/18 (EP,US);
C08L67/00, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L67/03, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/02] | C08L3/02, C08K5/00, C08L67/00, C08L67/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2015/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRPHASIGE BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MINDESTENS EINEM POLYMER PFLANZLICHEN URSPRUNGS | [2015/44] | English: | POLYPHASE BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE POLYMER OF VEGETABLE ORIGIN | [2016/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS BIODÉGRADABLES À PLUSIEURS PHASES CONTENANT AU MOINS UN POLYMÈRE D'ORIGINE VÉGÉTALE | [2015/44] |
Former [2015/02] | Mehrphasige biologisch abbaubare Zusammensetzungen mit mindestens einem Polymer pflanzlichen Ursprungs | ||
Former [2015/02] | Polyphase biodegradable compositions containing at least one polymer of vegetable origin | ||
Former [2015/02] | Compositions biodégradables à plusieurs phases contenant au moins un polymère d'origine végétale | Examination procedure | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 23.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11741565.3 / EP2601259 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2011 | AL | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IE | 05.08.2016 | LU | 05.08.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 05.08.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IE | 05.08.2016 | ||
LU | 05.08.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 06.04.2016 | |
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1621579 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-21 * example 18; claim - *; | [AD]WO9214782 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-21 * page 18 - page 20; example 2; claim - *; | [A] - SOLVAY CHEMICALS, "Polyglycerols-General Overview", (200911), pages 1 - 10, Product Data Sheet, URL: http://www.solvaychemicals.us/static/wma/pdf/1/6/9/5/8/PGL_overview.pdf, (20110403), XP002631092 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - SOLVAY CHEMICALS, "Polyglycerols in Industrial Applications", (200807), pages 1 - 11, Application Data Sheet, URL: http://www.solvaychemicals.us/static/wma/pdf/1/4/0/9/7/PGL_Industrial_Application.pdf, (20110404), XP002631093 [A] 1-21 * pages 7,10 * | by applicant | EP0559785 | EP0792309 | WO2006097353 | EP1117738 | EP0118240 | EP0327505 | WO9214782 |