EP2873849 - Valve for measuring out fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kromer, Ralf Schafgasse 7 71665 Vaihingen / DE | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 14184698.0 | 15.09.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | DE201310223453 | 18.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013223453 | [2015/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873849 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2873849 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/00, F02M51/06, F02M61/12, F02M61/20, F16K31/06 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
F02M63/0071 (EP);
F02M51/0675 (EP);
F02M51/0685 (EP);
F02M61/12 (EP);
F02M61/20 (EP);
F02M63/0075 (EP);
F02M2200/28 (EP);
F02M2200/50 (EP);
F02M2200/8061 (EP);
F02M2200/9069 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Ventil zum Zumessen von Fluid | [2015/21] | English: | Valve for measuring out fluid | [2015/21] | French: | Vanne pour l'ajout de fluide | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 04.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2014 | AL | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
TR | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.09.2014 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 09.11.2016 | |
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0138722 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 6 * * page 4, line 1 - line 20 * * page 7, line 6 - line 10 * [Y] 6,7,10-13; | [Y]EP2187037 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] *; | [Y]US5301874 (VOGT DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7 * abstract * * claims 1,5 * * column 5, line 55 - line 60 * * column 4, line 8 - line 23 *; | [YA]WO2006056611 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 8, line 8 - line 22 * * page 9, line 9 - line 29 * [A] 1-3; | [Y]WO2005113973 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 33 * * claims 1,5,7,9 * * page 6, paragraph 15 - paragraph 20 *; | [X]US2004211930 (ICHINOSE YUTA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8,11 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]DE19716856 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 7 * abstract * * claims 1,3 * | by applicant | DE10108945 |