EP2995880 - Improved boiler heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxi S.p.a. Via Trozzetti, 20 36061 Bassano del Grappa (VI) / IT | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Battistello, Valentino Via Fratte Basse, 19 36042 Breganze (VI) / IT | 02 /
Guderzo, Stefano Via San Michele, 45 36061 Bassano del Grappa (VI) / IT | 03 /
Sandro, Antonio Via Pio X, 7/c 36060 Romano d'Ezzelino (VI) / IT | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [2016/11] | Application number, filing date | 14184726.9 | 15.09.2014 | [2016/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2995880 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2995880 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/43, F24H9/02, F24H9/18 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
F24H1/43 (EP);
F24H9/02 (EP);
F24H9/1836 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2016/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 09.09.2016 | ME | 09.09.2016 | Title | German: | Verbesserter Boilerwärmetauscher | [2016/11] | English: | Improved boiler heat exchanger | [2016/11] | French: | Échangeur de chaleur de chaudière amélioré | [2016/11] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/42] | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | IT | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | NO | 01.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202011001615U (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * pages 4-10; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]WO2010140174 (RIELLO SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202011001615U |