EP2840633 - Lithium accumulators based on lithiated iron phosphate and carbon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prayon Rue Joseph Wauters 144 4480 Engis / BE | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patoux, Sébastien 16 Mail Marcel Cachin 38600 Fontaine / FR | 02 /
Martinet, Sébastien 208 Rue du Moulin 38210 ST. QUENTIN/ISERE / FR | 03 /
Launois, Sébastien 18 Rue André Rivoire 38100 GRENOBLE / FR | 04 /
Gourgue, Alain 48 Rue de la Bruyère 4287 LINCENT / BE | 05 /
Germeau, Alain 23 Rue Jean-Baptiste Vandercammen 1160 AUDERGHEM / BE | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 14184728.5 | 28.01.2011 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | EP20100151986 | 28.01.2010 Original published format: EP 10151986 | [2015/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2840633 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2840633 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, H01M4/62, H01M10/0525, C01G49/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
C01G49/009 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/362 (US);
C01G53/006 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/364 (KR,US);
H01M4/587 (KR,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/52 (EP,US);
C01P2002/54 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/52 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/028 (KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Lithium-Akku auf Lithiumeisenphosphat und Kohlenstoffbasis | [2015/09] | English: | Lithium accumulators based on lithiated iron phosphate and carbon | [2015/09] | French: | Accumulateurs au lithium à base de phosphate de fer lithié et de carbone | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 08.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11701509.9 / EP2529433 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | MT | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | GB | 28.01.2019 | IE | 28.01.2019 | LU | 28.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
MT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
IE | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
GB | 28.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1193783 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0049] - [0103] * * table 1 *; | [YD]EP1195827 (SONY CORP [JP]) [YD] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1261050 (UMICORE S A NV [BE], et al) [A] 1,13* paragraphs [0016] - [0028] *; | [XYI]WO2008067677 (PHOSTECH LITHIUM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,6-22,24 * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 13 * * page 11, line 10 - line 14 * * page 12, line 1 - line 31 * * page 13, line 12 - line 35 * * page 14, line 7 - line 10 * * page 14, line 27 - line 30 * * page 15, line 22 - line 28 * * page 21, line 30 - page 23, line 26 * * page 27, line 10 - page 29, line 15 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 23; | [Y]US2009061314 (DONG MING [CN]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0034] , [0031] - [0034] - [0040] , [0081] - [0084] * * paragraph 97 - sentence 120 *; | [A]EP2075864 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]) [A] 1-3,6,7,9-24 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0045] * * table 1 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2009117871 (BYD CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-3,6,9-17,22-24 * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 20 * * page 11, line 19 - page 19, line 5 * * page 21, line 5 - page 22, line 31 * * table 1 * | by applicant | US5464163 | EP1193783 | EP1195827 | EP1261050 | FR2848205 | WO2009117871 | - J.-M. TARASCON; M. ARMAND, NATURE, (2001), vol. 414, pages 359 - 367 |