EP2852220 - Beacons for wireless communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sampath, Hemanth c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Merlin, Simone c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
Abraham, Santosh Paul c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/13] | Application number, filing date | 14185131.1 | 20.08.2012 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | US201161525353P | 19.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161525353 P | US201213588293 | 17.08.2012 Original published format: US201213588293 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2852220 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2852220 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/08 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04B7/2603 (KR);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/13] | Title | German: | Baken für die drahtlose Kommunikation | [2015/13] | English: | Beacons for wireless communication | [2015/13] | French: | Balises pour communication sans fil | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 21.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12753332.1 / EP2745573 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | LU | 20.08.2017 | MT | 20.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/30] | CY | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 20.08.2017 | ||
MT | 20.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CY | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 20.08.2017 | ||
MT | 20.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CY | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 20.08.2017 | ||
MT | 20.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 20.08.2017 | ||
MT | 20.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 20.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003193895 (ENGWER DARWIN A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1542488 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006086878 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010142493 (SAKODA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2207278 (DA TANG MOBILE COMM EQUIPMENT [CN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |