EP2865603 - Retail packaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acco Brands Corporation Four Corporate Drive Lake Zurich, IL 60047-8997 / US | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marshall, Barry 1109 East River Parkway Santa Clara, CA California 95054 / US | 02 /
Hough, Graham 460 El Pintado Road Danville, CA California 94526 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 14185383.8 | 18.09.2014 | [2015/18] | Priority number, date | US201361896306P | 28.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361896306 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865603 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/50, B65D5/52 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
B65D5/5088 (EP,US);
A45C11/00 (US);
A45C13/004 (US);
B65D5/5213 (EP,US);
A45C2011/003 (US);
B65D2585/6837 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einzelhandelsverpackungssystem | [2015/18] | English: | Retail packaging system | [2015/18] | French: | Système d'emballage de vente au détail | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 29.05.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2657793 (MELVYN GOLDSHINE) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 3 - line 46 *; | [I]US2680512 (DOUGLAS YOUNG LEWIS) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [I]WO2011072806 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH], et al) [I] 1-15* page 13, paragraph l - page 14, line l; figures 1-6 * |