EP2851963 - Solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd 2-5-5 Keihanhondori Moriguchi-City, Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arimoto, Mamoru c/o SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi City Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | 02 /
Takahama, Tsuyoshi c/o SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi City Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Naofumi c/o SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi City Osaka, 570-8677 / JP | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14185957.9 | 23.09.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | JP20130196963 | 24.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013196963 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851963 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, H01L31/0224, H01L31/0747, H01L31/20 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H01L31/022441 (EP,US);
H01L31/03529 (US);
H01L31/0747 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
Y02E10/547 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Solarzelle | [2015/13] | English: | Solar cell | [2015/13] | French: | Cellule solaire | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 24.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008061293 (RIBEYRON PIERRE J [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract; paragraphs [0103] , [ 111] - [0114] - [ 118] - [0120]; figure 4c *; | [X]JP2009200267 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-5* abstract *; | [XDI]EP2600414 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [XD] 1-5,8 * abstract; paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0023] - [0025] - [0028] - [0031]; figures 1-2 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]US2013139876 (SHIGEMATSU MASATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,8 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] - [0 35] - [0037] - [0 40] - [0043] * [I] 6,7 | by applicant | JP2012033666 | JP2013033832 |