EP2846582 - Radio communications system, base station, user apparatus, and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishiyama, Yoshihisa c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOMOCO, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Tanno, Motohiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOMOCO, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Sawahashi, Mamoru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOMOCO, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/11] | Application number, filing date | 14186360.5 | 25.06.2009 | [2015/11] | Priority number, date | JP20080172813 | 01.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008172813 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2846582 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30, H04W24/08, H04W36/08 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
H04W36/302 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W36/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2015/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Funkkommunikationssystem, Basisstation, Benutzervorrichtung und Verfahren | [2015/11] | English: | Radio communications system, base station, user apparatus, and method | [2015/11] | French: | Système de communication radio, station de base, appareil utilisateur et procédé | [2015/11] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 08.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09773376.0 / EP2296419 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006205415 (REZAIIFAR RAMIN [US], et al); | [X]WO2007091607 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al); | [P]EP1983792 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) |