EP2902041 - Composition and method for generating a metabolic profile using 13C-MR detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gisselsson, Anna Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | 02 /
Hansson, Georg Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | 03 /
Mansson, Sven Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | 04 /
In't Zandt, René Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | 05 /
Karlsson, Magnus Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | 06 /
Jensen, Pernille R. Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | 07 /
Lerche, Mathilde H. Imagnia AB Box 8225 200 41 Malmö / SE | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 2003 Vika 0125 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 14186618.6 | 19.12.2007 | [2015/32] | Previously filed application, date | EP20070024585 | 19.12.2007 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902041 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/10, A61K49/20 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
A61K49/10 (EP,US);
A61K49/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines metabolischen Profils bei Verwendung von 13C-MR | [2015/32] | English: | Composition and method for generating a metabolic profile using 13C-MR detection | [2015/32] | French: | Composition et procédé pour générer un profil métabolique par 13C-MR | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 06.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07024585.7 / EP2072061 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007069909 (GE HEALTHCARE AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * examples 8,9,10a,10b; claims 1-22 *; | [Y]WO2007064226 (GE HEALTHCARE AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * examples 10,11; claims 1-19 *; | [Y]WO2007111515 (GE HEALTHCARE AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * claims 1-21 *; | [A]WO9924080 (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]WO9830918 (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-14; | [Y] - JORDAN P M ET AL, "Mechanistic and stereochemical investigation of fatty acid and polyketide biosynthesis using chiral malonates", TETRAHEDRON 1991 UNITED KINGDOM, (1991), vol. 47, no. 31, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 6015 - 6028, XP002470562 [Y] 1-14 * page 6016; figure Scheme1 * * page 6026, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)86493-0 | [Y] - HUANG S. ET AL., "Synthesis of (R)- and (S)-[1-13C1,2-2H1]malonate and its stereochemical analysis by NMR spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1986), vol. 108, pages 1100 - 1101, XP002470563 [Y] 1-14 * page 1100, column 2; figure SchemeI * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00265a051 | [Y] - MICKLEFIELD J. ET AL., "Stereochemical course of malonate decarboxylation in Malanomonas rubra", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1995), vol. 117, pages 1153 - 1154, XP002470564 [Y] 1-14 * compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00108a042 | [Y] - MCDONAGH A F ET AL, "Dissociation Constants of Carboxylic Acids by <13>C-NMR in DMSO/Water", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991203), vol. 40, no. 49, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 8515 - 8518, XP004184835 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(99)01841-9 | [Y] - CHEN B. ET AL., "Investigation of the mechanism of n-butane oxidation on vanadium phosphorus oxide catalysts: evidence from isotopic labeling studies", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2002), vol. 124, no. 8, pages 1638 - 1652, XP002470565 [Y] 1-14 * figure 3e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja010285v | [Y] - BROWN R. ET AL., "The microwave spectrum and structure of tricarbon monoxide", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1985), vol. 107, pages 4112 - 4115, XP002470566 [Y] 1-14 * page 4113, column 1, paragraph 5; compound III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00300a002 | [Y] - FINDER ET AL, "Transport and metabolism of exogenous fumarate and 3-phosphoglycerate in vascular smooth muscle.", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (19990501), vol. 195, no. 1-2, ISSN 0300-8177, pages 113 - 121, XP055060630 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 115; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006976432578 | [A] - LONDON R E, "C labeling in studies of metabolic regulation", PROGRESS IN NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY UK, (1988), vol. 20, ISSN 0079-6565, pages 337 - 383, XP002470567 [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0079-6565(88)80010-4 |