EP2857887 - Assembly and method to align displayed images to an overlaying applique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2018/51] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O.Box 5052 Troy MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blackmer, Stephen, C. 7565 Pine Grove Circle Millington, MI Michigan 48746 / US | 02 /
Liburdi, Steven, A. 281 Mckinley Avenue Grosse Pointe Farms, MI Michigan 48236 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14186848.9 | 29.09.2014 | [2015/15] | Priority number, date | US201314044963 | 03.10.2013 Original published format: US201314044963 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2857887 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/64, B60K37/02, B60Q3/04, G01D11/28, G09G3/02 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/213 (EP,US);
B60K35/215 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
B60K35/90 (EP,US);
G02B27/648 (EP,US);
B60K2360/344 (EP,US);
B60K2360/48 (EP,US);
B60K2360/688 (EP,US);
B60K2360/822 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0247 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0471 (US);
G09G2340/0478 (US);
G09G2340/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2015/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zum Ausrichten von angezeigten Bildern zu einer überlagernden Auflage | [2015/15] | English: | Assembly and method to align displayed images to an overlaying applique | [2015/15] | French: | Ensemble et procédé pour aligner des images affichées pour une application de superposition | [2015/15] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 14.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5936613 (JAEGER DENNY [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 16, line 44 - column 17, line 63 * * figures 27-30 *; | [A]JP2004299506 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006239017 (WOO VICTOR [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0098] *; | [I]US2007044535 (AVITIA CESAR [MX], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2009277375 (FANFA MARCELO R [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2012262680 (HUDMAN JOSHUA M [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1, 3 *; | [A]US2013112679 (VAN WYHE MATTHEW G [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]US2013174773 (NAGARA WES A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-6 * |