EP2821480 - Culture substrate for human pluripotent stem cells and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekiguchi, Kiyotoshi c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka, Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 02 /
Futaki, Sugiko c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka, Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 03 /
Taniguchi, Yukimasa c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka, Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 04 /
Hayashi, Maria c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka, Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | 05 /
Nakatsuji, Norio c/o Institute for Integrated Cell-Material Sciences Kyoto University Yoshida Ushinomiya-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 06 /
Miyazaki, Takamichi c/o Institute for Frontier Medical Sciences Kyoto University 53 Kawahara-cho Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | 07 /
Kawase, Eihachiro c/o Institute for Frontier Medical Sciences Kyoto University 53 Kawahara-cho Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | 08 /
Suemori, Hirofumi c/o Institute for Frontier Medical Sciences Kyoto University 53 Kawahara-cho Shogoin, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8507 / JP | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Kalhammer, Georg, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 14187130.1 | 07.10.2010 | [2015/02] | Priority number, date | JP20090234583 | 08.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009234583 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821480 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2821480 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0735, C12N5/074 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,US);
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12N2533/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kultursubstrat für menschliche pluripotente Stammzellen und Verwendung davon | [2015/02] | English: | Culture substrate for human pluripotent stem cells and use thereof | [2015/02] | French: | Substrat de culture pour cellules souches pluripotentes humaines, et son utilisation | [2015/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10822075.7 / EP2487236 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.10.2010 | AL | 16.08.2017 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | LU | 07.10.2017 | MT | 07.10.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.10.2010 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
MT | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.10.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - Y. TANIGUCHI ET AL, "The C-terminal Region of Laminin Chains Modulates the Integrin Binding Affinities of Laminins", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20090101), vol. 284, no. 12, doi:10.1074/jbc.M809332200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7820 - 7831, XP055022477 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 5,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M809332200 | [T] - TAKAMICHI MIYAZAKI ET AL, "Laminin E8 fragments support efficient adhesion and expansion of dissociated human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20121204), vol. 3, doi:10.1038/ncomms2231, page 1236, XP055055638 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms2231 | by applicant | - MIYAZAKI T; FUTAKI S; HASEGAWA K; KAWASAKI M; SANZEN N; HAYASHI M; KAWASE E; SEKIGUCHI K; NAKATSUJI N; SUEMORI H, "Recombinant human laminin isoforms can support the undifferentiated growth of human embryonic stem cells", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2008), vol. 375, pages 27 - 35 | - TANIGUCHI Y; IDO H; SANZEN N; HAYASHI M; SATO-NISHIUCHI R; FUTAKI S; SEKIGUCHI K, "The C-terminal region of laminin beta chains modulates the integrin binding affinities of laminins", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2009), vol. 284, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M809332200, pages 7820 - 7831, XP055022477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M809332200 | - EDGAR D.; TIMPL R.; THOENEN H., "The heparin-binding domain of laminin is responsible for its effects on neurite outgrowth and neuronal survival", EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055222218 | - GOODMAN SL.; DEUTZMANN R.; VON DER MARK K., "Two distinct cell-binding domains in laminin can independently promote nonneuronal cell adhesion and spreading", J. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.105.1.589, pages 589 - 598, XP055304702 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.105.1.589 | - HIROYUKI IDO; AYA NAKAMURA; REIKO KOBAYASHI; SHUNSUKE ITO; SHAOLIANG LI; SUGIKO FUTAKI; KIYOTOSHI SEKIGUCHI, "The requirement of the glutamic acid residue at the third position from the carboxyl termini of the laminin y chains in integrin binding by laminins", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 282, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M609402200, pages 11144 - 11154, XP008153460 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M609402200 | - LIU, Y. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2006), vol. 346, pages 131 - 139 | - VALLIER, L. ET AL., J. CELL SCI., (2005), vol. 118, pages 4495 - 4509 | - LI, Y. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2005), vol. 91, pages 688 - 698 | - YAO, S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2006), vol. 103, pages 6907 - 6912 | - LU, J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2006), vol. 103, pages 5688 - 5693 | - SEKIGUCHI K.; HAKOMORI S., "Domain structure of human plasma fibronectin. Differences and similarities between human and hamster fibronectins", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 258, pages 3967 - 3973 | - YATOHGO T.; IZUMI, M.; KASHIWAGI, H.; HAYASHI, M., "Novel purification of vitronectin from human plasma by heparin affinity chromatography", CELL STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION, (1988), vol. 13, pages 281 - 292 | - IDO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 10946 - 10954 | - IDO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 282, pages 11144 - 11154 | - HIROYUKI IDO; KENJI HARADA; SUGIKO FUTAKI; YOSHITAKA HAYASHI; RYOKO NISHIUCHI; YUKO NATSUKA; SHAOLIANG LI; YOSHINAO WADA; ARIANA C, "Molecular dissection of the a-dystroglycan- and integrin-binding sites within the globular domain of human laminin-10", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 279, pages 10946 - 10954 | - HIROYUKI IDO; KENJI HARADA; YOSHIKI YAGI; KIYOTOSHI SEKIGUCHI, "Probing the integrin-binding site within the globular domain of laminin-511 with the function-blocking monoclonal antibody 4C7", MATRIX BIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 25, pages 112 - 117 | - YUKIMASA TANIGUCHI; HIROYUKI IDO; NORIKO SANZEN; MARIA HAYASHI; RYOKO SATO-NISHIUCHI; SUGIKO FUTAKI; KIYOTOSHI SEKIGUCHI, "The C-terminal region of laminin (3 chains modulates the integrin binding affinities of laminins", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 284, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M809332200, pages 7820 - 7831, XP055022477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M809332200 |