EP2858229 - Apparatus for Connecting a Shared DC Bus Link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matocky, Mathew S. 11211 N. Swan Road Mequon, WI Wisconsin 53097 / US | 02 /
Bronk, Kelley J. 765 Chief Kewaskum Place Kewaskum, WI Wisconsin 53040 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 14187273.9 | 01.10.2014 | [2015/15] | Priority number, date | US201314046458 | 04.10.2013 Original published format: US201314046458 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2858229 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2858229 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/00, H01R12/70, H01R31/02, // H01R25/14 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
H01R25/142 (EP,CN,US);
H01R12/7088 (EP,CN,US);
H01R31/02 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2015/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbindung eines gemeinsamen Gleichstrom-Buskopplers | [2015/15] | English: | Apparatus for Connecting a Shared DC Bus Link | [2015/15] | French: | Appareil permettant de connecter une liaison de bus CC partagée | [2015/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 14.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2014 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.10.2014 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4475781 (ASICK JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]US2011261508 (ROSS STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0063]; figures 8A-8C *; | [A]US2009047814 (DAAMEN RON [NL]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014]; figures 1-6C *; | [A]EP1998407 (ARTESYN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 6A-6B; claim 1 *; | [A]US2013012072 (COSTELLO BRIAN PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-7; claim 1 * |