EP2838064 - Recomendation systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piksel, Inc. 1209 Orange Street New Castle Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanigsberg, Issar Amit 122 Corner Ridge Road Aurora, Ontario L4G 6LA / CA | 02 /
Veidlinger, Daniel M 1969 Sutter Str. Apt 1 San Francisco, CA California 94115 / US | 03 /
Mozersky, Myer J 440 Fieldsone Drive Kingston, Ontario K7K 7E2 / CA | 04 /
Shazli, Tamer El 3379 Whilabout Terr Oakville, Ontario L6L 0A7 / CA | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 14187503.9 | 24.04.2008 | [2015/08] | Priority number, date | US20070807191 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: US 807191 | US20070807218 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: US 807218 | US20070981648 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: US 981648 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838064 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2015/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Empfehlungssysteme und Verfahren | [2015/08] | English: | Recomendation systems and methods | [2015/08] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de recommandation | [2015/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/22] | Appeal following examination | 24.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T2141/18 | 26.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.02.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08743225.8 / EP2188712 | EP13194508.1 / EP2704080 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.09.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2015 | 30.04.2020 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1050830 (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1-20 * abstract *; | [E]KR101230034B (KONG MI SUN [KR]) [E] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | - Y. TANG; P. REED; T. WAGENER, "How effective and efficient are multiobjective evolutionary algorithms at hydrologic model calibration?", HYDROL. EARTH SYST. SCI., (2006), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.5194/hess-10-289-2006, pages 289 - 307, XP007914294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5194/hess-10-289-2006 |