EP2990081 - Figure trimmer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyaco International Inc. 12F., No. 111, Songjiang Rd. Zhongshan Dist. 104 Taipei City / TW | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tung, Hung Ta 12F, No. 111 Songjiang Road 104 Taipei / TW | 02 /
Huang, Hsuan-Fu 12F., No. 111, Songjiang Rd. Zhongshan Dist. 104 Taipei City / TW | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Dietlindenstrasse 18 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14187898.3 | 07.10.2014 | [2016/09] | Priority number, date | TW20140129577 | 27.08.2014 Original published format: TW 103129577 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2990081 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/02, A63B22/14, A63B22/16, A63B23/035, A63B21/00, A63B22/00 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A63B22/14 (EP,US);
A63B21/028 (EP,US);
A63B21/0552 (US);
A63B21/4034 (EP,US);
A63B21/4047 (EP,US);
A63B21/4049 (EP,US);
A63B22/0058 (EP,US);
A63B22/16 (EP,US);
A63B23/0222 (US);
A63B23/03525 (EP,US);
A63B23/03541 (EP,US);
A63B2022/003 (EP,US);
A63B21/008 (EP,US);
A63B21/0085 (EP,US);
A63B21/023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Figur-Trimmer | [2016/09] | English: | Figure trimmer | [2016/09] | French: | Sous-vêtement amincissant | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7878960 (LIU FEN-YING [TW]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * column 3 - column 5; figure - * [Y] 4-7,11,12; | [Y]DE202014102450U (DYACO INT INC [TW]) [Y] 4-6 * page 3 - page 5; figure - *; | [Y]US2010248923 (LO MING-AN [TW]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]US2012108406 (JEONG YEON OK [KR]) [Y] 11 * page 3 - page 5; figure - *; | [Y]US2009239713 (CHU YONG S [US]) [Y] 12 * page 2 - page 4; figure - *; | [X]US2011071006 (LAI YING-CHOU [TW]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US7104928 (LIU WEI MING [TW], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | TWM330099U |