EP3009420 - Method for the production of biphenylamines from anilides using ruthenium catalysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50, Building 6100 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | For all designated states Georg-August-Universität Göttingen Stiftung Öffentlichen Rechts Wilhelmsplatz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50, Building 6100 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
For all designated states Georg-August-Universität Göttingen Stiftung Öffentlichen Rechts Wilhelmsplatz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Himmler, Thomas Schoene Aussicht 1b 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Rodefeld, Lars Am Scherfenbrand 110A 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Hubrich, Jonathan Gartenstrasse 44 37073 Göttingen / DE | 04 /
Ackermann, Lutz Ernst-Fahlbusch-Strasse 1 37077 Göllingen / DE | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 14189192.9 | 16.10.2014 | [2016/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3009420 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/12 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
C07C231/12 (EP);
B01J27/12 (EP);
B01J31/0227 (EP);
B01J31/2295 (EP);
B01J31/26 (EP);
B01J2231/46 (EP);
B01J2531/821 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/12, C07C233/07 (EP);
C07C231/12, C07C233/15 (EP);
C07C231/12, C07C233/25 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Biphenylaminen aus Aniliden durch Rutheniumkatalyse | [2016/16] | English: | Method for the production of biphenylamines from anilides using ruthenium catalysis | [2016/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de biphénylamine à partir d'anilide par catalyse de ruthénium | [2016/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2119697 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP2008991 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 * | [XYI] - RAVI KIRAN CHINNAGOLLA ET AL, "Ruthenium-catalyzed ortho-arylation of acetanilides with aromatic boronic acids: an easy route to prepare phenanthridines and carbazoles", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20140107), vol. 50, no. 19, doi:10.1039/c3cc49398a, ISSN 1359-7345, page 2442, XP055141599 [X] 12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-13 [I] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3cc49398a | by applicant | WO2014019995 | WO0142223 | WO03070705 | WO2007138089 | WO2009003650 | WO2009135598 | - S. L. BUCHWALD ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2008), vol. 10, no. 11, pages 2207 - 10 | - F. GLORIUS ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2012), vol. 51, pages 2247 - 51 | - BULL. KOREAN CHEM. SOC, (2000), vol. 21, pages 165 - 166 | - BULL. KOREAN CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 21, pages 165 - 166 | - Z.SHI ET AL., ANGEW.CHEM. INT. ED., (2007), vol. 46, pages 5554 - 8 | - B.H.LIPSHUTZ ET AL., J.AMER.CHEM.SOC., (2010), vol. 132, pages 4978 - 9 |