EP2866007 - Row by row adjustable focal plane array for hyperspectral imagers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2015/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rappoport, William 1 Ledgebrook Court Weston, CT 06883 / US | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14189751.2 | 21.10.2014 | [2015/18] | Priority number, date | US201361894115P | 22.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361894115 P | US201414194332 | 28.02.2014 Original published format: US201414194332 | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2866007 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2866007 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28, G01J3/36, G01J3/42, H04N5/353 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
H04N23/76 (EP,US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J3/36 (EP,US);
G01J3/42 (EP,US);
H04N23/11 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/18] | G01J3/28, G01J3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reihe für Reihe anpassbares Fokalebenenarray mit für hyperspektrale Bildgeber | [2015/18] | English: | Row by row adjustable focal plane array for hyperspectral imagers | [2015/18] | French: | Réseau de plan focal réglable rangée par rangée pour des dispositifs d'imagerie hyperspectrale | [2015/18] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5760899 (EISMANN MICHAEL T [US]); | [IY]US6175383 (YADID-PECHT ORLY [US], et al); | [XYI]US6678048 (RIENSTRA JEFFREY L [US], et al); | [XI]US2013187028 (SALVESTRINI KENNETH R [US], et al) |