EP3015855 - Metal biosensors based on compounds with metal-sensitive chemical shifts for magnetic resonance spectroscopy and imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klinikum rechts der Isar der Technischen Universität München Ismaninger Straße 22 81675 München / DE | For all designated states Helmholtz Zentrum München Deutsches Forschungszentrum für Gesundheit und Umwelt GmbH Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1 85764 Neuherberg / DE | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westmeyer, Gil Gregor Wartburgplatz 6 80804 Munich / DE | 02 /
Mishra, Anurag Ruemannstr. 61 80804 Munich / DE | 03 /
Pariani, Giorgio Passauerstr. 23 81369 München / DE | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14190482.1 | 27.10.2014 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015855 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, A61B5/055, A61K49/06, G01R33/28, G01R33/465, G01R33/56 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G01N24/08 (EP);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61K49/103 (EP);
G01R33/281 (EP);
G01R33/465 (EP);
G01R33/5601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Metall-Biosensoren auf Basis von Verbindungen mit metallempfindlichen chemischen Verschiebungen für magnetische Resonanzspektroskopie und Magnetresonanzbildgebung | [2016/18] | English: | Metal biosensors based on compounds with metal-sensitive chemical shifts for magnetic resonance spectroscopy and imaging | [2016/18] | French: | Biocapteurs métalliques à base de composés avec déplacements chimiques sensibles au métal pour la spectroscopie par résonance magnétique nucléaire et imagerie | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5188816 (SHERRY A DEAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 7 - line 14 * * column 8, line 58 - column 9, line 11 * * column 10, line 40 - line 68; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0790241 (UNIV MADRID NAC EDUCACION [ES], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, line 50 - page 11, line 4 * * page 15, line 35 - line 51 *; | [XI]US2006193781 (FREDERICKSON CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,18,19 * paragraphs [0029] , [0031] - [0049] - [0066] * [I] 2,5,11-17; | [XDI] - SMITH G A ET AL, "Intracellular calcium measurements by 19F NMR of fluorine-labeled chelators.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEC 1983, (198312), vol. 80, no. 23, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 7178 - 7182, XP002739022 [XD] 1,2,6,8-10,18,19 * the whole document * [I] 5,11-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.80.23.7178 | [AD] - BAR-SHIR, A. ET AL., "Metal Ion Sensing Using Ion Chemical Exchange Saturation Transfer (19)F Magnetic Resonance Imaging", JAM CHEM SOC., (2013), XP002739035 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja403542g | [A] - LIMIAO JIANG ET AL, "Eliminating the dication-induced intersample chemical-shift variations for NMR-based biofluid metabonomic analysis", THE ANALYST, (20120101), vol. 137, no. 18, doi:10.1039/c2an35392j, ISSN 0003-2654, page 4209, XP055186422 [A] 1 * page 4211 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2an35392j | by applicant | WO9830918 | WO9924080 | WO9935508 | - ANGELOVSKI, G.; CHAUVIN, T.; POHMAIM, R.; LOGOTHETIS, N. K.; T6TH, E., "Calcium-responsive paramagnetic CEST agents", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bmc.2010.07.023, pages 1097 - 1105, XP028133974 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2010.07.023 | - ARDENKJAER-LARSEN, J. H.; FRIDLUND, B.; GRAM, A.; HANSSON, G.; HANSSON, L.; LERCHE, M. H. ET AL., "Increase in signal-to-noise ratio of 10,000 times in liquid-state NMR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 18, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1733835100, pages 10158 - 10163, XP002280244 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1733835100 | - ATANASIJEVIC, T.; SHUSTEFF, M.; FAM, P.; JASANOFF, A., "Calcium-sensitive MRI contrast agents based on superparamagnetic iron oxide nanoparticles and calmodulin", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 40, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0606749103, pages 14707 - 14712, XP055005337 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0606749103 | - CARAVAN, P., "Strategies for increasing the sensitivity of gadolinium based MRI contrast agents.", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (2006), vol. 35, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1039/B510982P, pages 512 - 523, XP008152996 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B510982P | - CARTER, K. P.; YOUNG, A. M.; PALMER, A. E., "Fluorescent Sensors for Measuring Metal Ions in Living Systems", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2014), vol. 114, no. 8, pages 4564 - 4601 | - DURHAM, A. C. H.; WALTON, J. M., "A survey of the available colorimetric indicators for Ca2+ and Mg2+ ions in biological experiments", CELL CALCIUM, (1983), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0143-4160(83)90048-9, pages 47 - 55, XP026180113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0143-4160(83)90048-9 | - ELLIS-DAVIES, G. C. R., "Neurobiology with Caged Calcium.", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2008), vol. 108, no. 5, pages 1603 - 1613 | - HENRY, P.-G.; MARJANSKA, M.; WALLS, J. D.; VALETTE, J.; GRUETTER, R.; U URBIL, K., "Proton-observed carbon-edited NMR spectroscopy in strongly coupled second-order spin systems", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE / SOCIETY OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 55, no. 2, pages 250 - 257 | - JINDAL, A. K.; MERRITT, M. E.; SUH, E. H.; MALLOY, C. R.; SHERRY, A. D.; KOVACS, Z., "Hyperpolarized 89Y complexes as pH sensitive NMR probes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 132, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1021/ja910278e, pages 1784 - 1785, XP055104075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja910278e | - LOOGER, L. L., GENETICALLY ENCODED CALCIUM INDICATORS FOR MULTI-COLOR NEURAL ACTIVITY IMAGING AND COMBINATION WITH OPTOGENETICS, (2013), page 1 29 | - MISHRA, A.; LOGOTHETIS, N. K.; PARKER, D., "Critical In Vitro Evaluation of Responsive MRI Contrast Agents for Calcium and Zinc.", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 1529 - 1537 | - NELSON SJ; OZHINSKY E; LI Y; PARK I; CRANE J., "Strategies for rapid in vivo 1H and hyperpolarized 13C MR spectroscopic imaging.", J MAGN RESON, (2013), vol. 229, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jmr.2013.02.003, pages 187 - 97, XP055087156 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmr.2013.02.003 | - NELSON SJ; KURHANEWICZ J; VIGNERON DB; LARSON PE; HARZSTARK AL; FERRONE M; VAN CRIEKINGE M; CHANG JW; BOK R; PARK I, "Metabolic Imaging of Patients with Prostate Cancer Using Hyperpolarized [1 - C]Pyruvate.", SCI TRANS MED., (20130814), vol. 5, no. 198, page 198RA108, XP008165762 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3006070 | - NONAKA, H.; HATA, R.; DOURA, T.; NISHIHARA, T.; KUMAGAI, K.; AKAKABE, M. ET AL., "A platform for designing hyperpolarized magnetic resonance chemical probes", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (2013), vol. 4, pages 1 - 7 | - NTZIACHRISTOS, V., "Going deeper than microscopy: the optical imaging frontier in biology", NATURE METHODS, (2010), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1483, pages 603 - 614, XP055061383 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1483 | - OTTEN, P. A.; LONDON, R. E.; LEVY, L. A., "A new approach to the synthesis of APTRA indicators.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 76 - 83 | - PEREZ, J. M.; JOSEPHSON, L.; O'LOUGHLIN, T.; HOGEMANN, D.; WEISSLEDER, R., "Magnetic relaxation switches capable of sensing molecular interactions", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2002), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt720, pages 816 - 820, XP002566522 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt720 | - QUE, E. L.; CHANG, C. J., "Responsive magnetic resonance imaging contrast agents as chemical sensors for metals in biology and medicine.", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (2010), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 51 - 60 | - V. RIEKE; K. VIGEN; G. SOMMER; B. DANIEL; J. PAULY; K. BUTTS, "Referenceless PRF Shift thermometry", MRM, (200406), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/mrm.20090, pages 1223 - 31, XP002354056 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20090 | - ROBITAILLE, P. M.; JIANG, Z., "New calcium-sensitive ligand for nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, no. 50, pages 12585 - 12591 | - F A SCHANNE; T. L. D. R. K. G. J. F. R., "Development of 19F NMR for measurement of [Ca2+]i and [Pb2+]i in cultured osteoblastic bone cells.", ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH PERSPECTIVES,, (1990), vol. 84, page 99 | - SHAPIRO, M. G.; ATANASIJEVIC, T.; FAAS, H.; WESTMEYER, G. G.; JASANOFF, A., "Dynamic imaging with MRI contrast agents: quantitative considerations.", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (2006), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mri.2005.12.033, pages 449 - 462, XP028004846 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mri.2005.12.033 | - SMITH, G. A.; HESKETH, R. T.; METCALFE, J. C.; FEENEY, J.; MORRIS, P. G., "Intracellular calcium measurements by 19F NMR of fluorine-labeled chelators", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,, (1983), vol. 80, no. 23, pages 7178 - 7182, XP002739022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.80.23.7178 | - STEENBERGEN, C.; MURPHY, E.; LEVY, L.; LONDON, R. E., "Elevation in cytosolic free calcium concentration early in myocardial ischemia in perfused rat heart.", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 60, no. 5, pages 700 - 707 | - VERMA, K. D.; FORGACS, A.; UH, H.; BEYERLEIN, M.; MAIER, M. E.; PETOUD, S. ET AL., "New Calcium-Selective Smart Contrast Agents for Magnetic Resonance Imaging", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2013), vol. 19, no. 52, pages 18011 - 18026 | - VIALE, A.; AIME, S., "Current concepts on hyperpolarized molecules in MRI.", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cbpa.2009.10.021, pages 90 - 96, XP026895607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2009.10.021 | - WINER, J. L.; LIU, C. Y.; APUZZO, M. L. J., "The use of nanoparticles as contrast media in neuroimaging: a statement on toxicity.", WORLD NEUROSURGERY, (2012), vol. 78, no. 6, pages 709 - 711 |