EP2874097 - Automatic scene parsing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, Lixin Suoliojankatu 2 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Hajiani, M. Pouria Insinöörinkatu 60 B 133 33720 Tampere / FI | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 14191033.1 | 30.10.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | GB20130020361 | 19.11.2013 Original published format: GB 201320361 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2874097 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2874097 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T7/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06V20/39 (GB);
G06V20/56 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (GB);
G06V20/10 (GB);
G06T2207/10028 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatisches Szenenparsing | [2015/21] | English: | Automatic scene parsing | [2015/21] | French: | Analyse automatique de scènes | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - CHENXI ZHANG ET AL, Semantic Segmentation of Urban Scenes Using Dense Depth Maps, COMPUTER VISION - ECCV 2010, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 708 - 721, (20100905), ISBN 978-3-642-15560-4, XP019150776 [X] 1,3-8,10-12 * section 2 * * sections 3.1-3.4 * * section 4, first paragraph * * section 4.1, second paragraph * * section 5 * [I] 2,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-15561-1_51 | [XI] - MAHMOUDABADI HAMID ET AL, "Superpixel Clustering and Planar Fit Segmentation of 3D LIDAR Point Clouds", 2013 FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTING FOR GEOSPATIAL RESEARCH AND APPLICATION, IEEE, (20130722), doi:10.1109/COMGEO.2013.2, pages 1 - 7, XP032485214 [X] 1-6,8,10-12 * abstract * * section II, first paragraph * * section III, first paragraph * * sections III.A-III.C * [I] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/COMGEO.2013.2 | [A] - Anonymous, "3D scanner - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20131018), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=3D_scanner&oldid=577685741, (20150616), XP055196249 [A] 2 * the whole document * | [A] - DIETERICH T, "An experimental comparison of three methods for constructing ensembles of decision trees: bagging, boosting, and randomization", MACHINE LEARNING, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BOSTON, US, (20000801), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:10.1023/A:1007607513941, ISSN 0885-6125, pages 139 - 157, XP008082822 [A] 9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007607513941 |