EP2839860 - Pyrrolobenzodiazepines and conjugates thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB21 6GH / GB | [2015/43] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Spirogen Sàrl Rue Saint-Pierre2 1003 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Philip Wilson Spirogen Limited The QMB Innovation Centre 42 New Road London, Greater London E1 2AX / GB | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2015/09] | Watson, Robert James Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14191079.4 | 11.10.2013 | [2015/09] | Priority number, date | US201261712928P | 12.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261712928 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839860 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839860 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, A61K47/65, A61P39/00, A61P35/00, C07D487/04, C07D519/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61K47/6855 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,EA,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61K47/65 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6891 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
Y02P20/582 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | A61P39/00, A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2015/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 19.08.2015 | ME | 19.08.2015 | Title | German: | Pyrrolobenzodiazepine und Konjugate davon | [2015/09] | English: | Pyrrolobenzodiazepines and conjugates thereof | [2015/09] | French: | Pyrrolobenzodiazépines et ses conjugués | [2015/09] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.04.2018 | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13780100.7 / EP2766048 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2011130598 (SPIROGEN LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-15 * compound 80 (page 149, 134) *; | [Y] - STEPHEN C. ALLEY ET AL, "Contribution of Linker Stability to the Activities of Anticancer Immunoconjugates", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20080301), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:10.1021/bc7004329, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 759 - 765, XP055037546 [Y] 1-15 * abstract, section "Discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc7004329 | [Y] - Richard P Haughland, "Section 2.1: Introduction to Thiol Modification and Detection", The Handbook - A guide to Fluorescent Probes and Labeling Technologies, Invitrogen Corp., (20050101), pages 96 - 98, XP055096281 [Y] 1-15 * section "Iodoacetamides" and "Maleimides" * | Examination | - Greg T Hermanson, "Thiol-Reactive Chemical Reactions", Bioconjugate Techniques, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, ACADEMIC PRESS, (19960101), pages 146 - 148, XP055275993 | by applicant | JPS58180487 | US4816567 | WO9102536 | US5047507 | WO9207574 | WO9217497 | EP0522868 | JPH053790B | WO9410312 | WO9428931 | US5440021 | US5472693 | WO9630514 | US5583024 | WO9707198 | US5644033 | US5674713 | US5686292 | WO9744452 | US5700670 | US5736137 | US5763202 | US5773223 | US5792616 | WO9837193 | WO9840403 | EP0875569 | WO9851805 | WO9851824 | US5854399 | US5869445 | US5877293 | US5891996 | WO9928468 | WO9946284 | US5955075 | US5976551 | WO9958658 | US6011146 | US6013772 | WO0012130 | WO0014228 | WO0020579 | WO0022129 | US6054297 | WO0032752 | WO0036107 | WO0040614 | WO0044899 | US6107090 | WO0053216 | WO0055351 | US6129915 | US6150508 | US6153408 | US6159508 | WO0075655 | WO0100244 | WO0109192 | WO0116318 | US6217866 | US6235883 | WO0138490 | WO0140269 | WO0140309 | WO0141787 | WO0146261 | WO0146232 | WO0145746 | WO0148204 | WO0153463 | WO0157188 | WO0162794 | WO0166689 | WO0172962 | WO0172830 | WO0175177 | WO0177172 | WO0188133 | WO0190304 | WO0194641 | US6333405 | WO0198351 | US2001055751 | WO0202634 | WO0202624 | WO0202587 | WO0206339 | WO0206317 | WO0210382 | WO0210187 | WO0212341 | WO0213847 | WO0214503 | WO0216429 | WO0216413 | WO0222808 | WO0222636 | WO0222153 | US2002034749 | WO0222660 | WO0224909 | WO0226822 | US2002042366 | WO0230268 | US6383487 | WO0238766 | US6417337 | WO02054940 | WO02059377 | WO02061087 | WO02060317 | WO02064798 | WO02071928 | WO02072596 | US2002142359 | WO02078524 | US2002150573 | WO02081646 | WO02083866 | WO02086443 | WO02088170 | WO02089747 | WO02092836 | WO02094852 | WO02099122 | WO02098358 | WO02099074 | WO02098897 | WO02101075 | US2002193567 | WO02102235 | WO03000842 | WO03002717 | WO03003906 | WO03003984 | WO03004529 | WO03004989 | WO03008537 | WO03009814 | US6518404 | US6521230 | WO03014294 | WO03016475 | WO03016494 | WO03018621 | US6534482 | WO03022995 | WO03023013 | EP1295944 | WO03024392 | WO03025138 | WO03025148 | US2003060612 | WO03025228 | US2003064397 | US2003065143 | WO03026493 | WO03029421 | WO03029262 | WO03029277 | US2003077676 | US6555339 | WO03034984 | WO03035846 | WO03034903 | US2003091580 | WO03042661 | US2003096961 | WO03045422 | US2003105292 | US2003109676 | WO03048202 | US2003118592 | US2003119131 | US2003119122 | US2003119126 | US2003119121 | US2003119129 | US2003119130 | US2003119128 | US2003119125 | US2003124140 | WO03054152 | US2003124579 | US6590088 | WO03055443 | US2003129192 | WO03055439 | US2003134790 | US2003143557 | WO03062401 | US6602677 | WO03064606 | US2003157089 | US2003165504 | WO03072036 | WO03072035 | EP1347046 | WO03077836 | US2003185830 | WO03081210 | US2003186372 | US2003186373 | WO03083074 | WO03083041 | WO03083047 | US2003194704 | WO03087768 | WO03087306 | WO03089624 | WO03089904 | WO03088808 | US2003206918 | WO03093444 | US6653104 | US2003219806 | WO03097803 | US2003224454 | US2003224411 | WO03101283 | WO03101400 | US2003228319 | US2003232056 | WO03104275 | WO03104270 | WO03104399 | US2003232350 | WO03105758 | WO2004000997 | WO2004001004 | WO2004000221 | US2004001827 | US2004005598 | US2004005538 | US2004005320 | US2004005563 | US2004005647 | WO2004009622 | US2004018553 | US2004018198 | WO2004011611 | US2004022727 | WO2004015426 | US2004033229 | WO2004016225 | EP1394274 | US2004044180 | US2004044179 | WO2004020595 | WO2004020583 | WO2004022778 | WO2004022709 | WO2004027049 | US6716966 | WO2004031238 | JP2004113151 | WO2004032842 | US6730300 | WO2004040000 | WO2004042346 | US2004101874 | WO2004043361 | WO2004044178 | US2004101899 | WO2004045553 | WO2004045516 | WO2004046342 | WO2004045520 | WO2004048938 | WO2004047749 | US2004115193 | WO2004053079 | US6759045 | WO2004058309 | EP1439393 | WO2004063362 | WO2004063709 | WO2004063355 | WO2004065577 | WO2004065576 | US2004166544 | WO2004074320 | US2004197325 | US6824993 | US2004249130 | US2005031623 | US2005037431 | US2005054019 | US2005053608 | US2005059087 | WO2005079479 | US2005233960 | US2006018899 | US2006035907 | US2006035278 | US2006083736 | US2006088523 | US2006134104 | US7109304 | US7129332 | US7135301 | US2006270594 | US7147850 | US7183388 | US7202346 | WO2007044515 | US2007092520 | US2007098707 | US2007129301 | US7230084 | WO2007085930 | US2007202044 | US7300644 | US2007274991 | US2008057063 | US2008069775 | US2008138898 | US2008177046 | US2008176310 | US2008176258 | US2008206239 | US7462696 | US7465449 | US2009092598 | US7521541 | WO2009052249 | US7534431 | US2009156790 | US2009155282 | US7550142 | US2009162382 | US2009169550 | US7557189 | US2009175860 | US2009175887 | US2009175863 | US2009187007 | US2009185974 | US2009202546 | US2009232810 | US2009240038 | US2009252738 | US2009285837 | US7628986 | US2009304721 | US2009311803 | US2010016241 | US2010028337 | US2010040629 | US7666425 | US7674605 | US7691375 | US2010115639 | US7723485 | US2010129369 | US7736644 | EP1827492 | US2010221175 | US7811564 | US7816493 | WO2010128087 | US7850971 | US2010330103 | US7875278 | US2011028129 | US7897351 | US7902338 | US2011064653 | US7919273 | US2011097262 | US2011104176 | US7943742 | US2011117097 | US2011123537 | US2011129481 | US7968687 | US7968685 | US2011159014 | US2011171208 | US7982017 | US2011189085 | US2011206701 | US2011217305 | US8021856 | US2011239316 | WO2011130598 | US2012052070 | US2012082664 | - LEIMGRUBER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1965), vol. 87, pages 5793 - 5795 | - LEIMGRUBER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1965), vol. 87, pages 5791 - 5793 | - THURSTON ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1994), pages 433 - 465 | - ANTONOW, D.; THURSTON, D.E., CHEM. REV., (2011), vol. 111, no. 4, pages 2815 - 2864 | - HOCHLOWSKI ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1987), vol. 40, pages 145 - 148 | - KONISHI ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1984), vol. 37, pages 200 - 206 | - THURSTON ET AL., CHEM. BRIT., (1990), vol. 26, pages 767 - 772 | - BOSE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1992), vol. 48, pages 751 - 758 | - KUMINOTO ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1980), vol. 33, pages 665 - 667 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1976), vol. 29, pages 93 - 96 | - TSUNAKAWA ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1988), vol. 41, pages 1366 - 1373 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1982), vol. 29, pages 2492 - 2503 | - LANGLEY; THURSTON, J. ORG. CHEM., (1987), vol. 52, pages 91 - 97 | - HARA ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1988), vol. 41, pages 702 - 704 | - ITOH ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1988), vol. 41, pages 1281 - 1284 | - LEBER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1988), vol. 110, pages 2992 - 2993 | - ARIMA ET AL., J. ANTIBIOTICS, (1972), vol. 25, pages 437 - 444 | - KOHN, Antibiotics, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1975), pages 3 - 11 | - HURLEY; NEEDHAM-VANDEVANTER, ACC. CHEM. RES., (1986), vol. 19, pages 230 - 237 | - GREGSON ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1999), pages 797 - 798 | - GREGSON ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2001), vol. 44, pages 1161 - 1174 | - CARTER, P., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 6, pages 343 - 357 | - XIE ET AL., EXPERT. OPIN. BIOL. THER., (2006), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 281 - 291 | - KOVTUN ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 3214 - 3121 | - LAW ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, no. 4, pages 2328 - 2337 | - WU ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1137 - 1145 | - LAMBERT J., CURRENT OPIN. IN PHARMACOL., (2005), vol. 5, pages 543 - 549 | - HAMANN P., EXPERT OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2005), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 1087 - 1103 | - PAYNE, G., CANCER CELL, (2003), vol. 3, pages 207 - 212 | - TRAIL ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER, (2003), vol. 52, pages 328 - 337 | - SYRIGOS; EPENETOS, ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 19, pages 605 - 614 | - JUNUTULA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (2008), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 925 - 932 | - DORNAN ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 114, no. 13, pages 2721 - 2729 | - MCDONAGH, PROTEIN ENG. DESIGN & SEL., (2006), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 299 - 307 | - DORONINA ET AL., BIOCONJ. CHEM., (2006), vol. 17, pages 114 - 124 | - ERICKSON ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 1 - 8 | - SANDERSON ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, pages 843 - 852 | - JEFFREY ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, pages 1344 - 1358 | - HAMBLETT ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 7063 - 7070 | - MILLER ET AL., JOUR. OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 170, pages 4854 - 4861 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - LONBERG, CURR. OPINION, (2008), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 450 - 459 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY (N.Y., (1994), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903 | - ALTUVIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 249, pages 244 - 250 | - MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 44, pages 1986 - 1998 | - METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, pages 43 - 60 | - TEN DIJKE,P. ET AL., SCIENCE, (19931214), vol. 264, no. 5155, pages 101 - 104 | - ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14 10, no. 11, pages 1377 - 1382 | - NATURE, (1998), vol. 395, no. 6699, pages 288 - 291 | - GAUGITSCH, H.W., J. BIOL. CHEM., (19911220), vol. 267, no. 16, pages 11267 - 11273 | - CANCER RES., (2001), vol. 61, no. 15, pages 5857 - 5860 | - HUBERT, R.S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1999), vol. 96, no. 25, pages 14523 - 14528 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, no. 29, pages 27371 - 27375 | - YAMAGUCHI, N. ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 2, pages 805 - 808 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1999), vol. 96, no. 20, pages 11531 - 11536 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1996), vol. 93 10, no. 1, pages 136 - 140 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, no. 37, pages 21984 - 21990 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 22, pages 19665 - 19672 | - GENOMICS, (1999), vol. 62, no. 2, pages 281 - 284 | - FEILD, J.A. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1999), vol. 258, no. 3, pages 578 - 582 | - NAGASE T. ET AL., DNA RES., (2000), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 143 - 150 | - ROSS ET AL., CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 62, pages 2546 - 2553 | - NAKAMUTA M. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1991), vol. 177, pages 34 - 39 | - OGAWA Y. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1991), vol. 178, pages 248 - 255 | - ARAI H. ET AL., JPN. CIRC. J., (1992), vol. 56, pages 1303 - 1307 | - ARAI H. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 3463 - 3470 | - SAKAMOTO A.; YANAGISAWA M. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1991), vol. 178, pages 656 - 663 | - ELSHOURBAGY N.A. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1993), vol. 268, pages 3873 - 3879 | - HAENDLER B. ET AL., J. CARDIOVASC. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 20, pages S1 - S4 | - TSUTSUMI M. ET AL., GENE, (1999), vol. 228, pages 43 - 49 | - STRAUSBERG RL. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 16899 - 16903 | - BOURGEOIS C. ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (1997), vol. 82, pages 3116 - 3123 | - OKAMOTO Y. ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 21589 - 21596 | - VERHEIJ J.B. ET AL., AM. J. MED. GENET., (2002), vol. 108, pages 223 - 225 | - HOFSTRA R.M.W. ET AL., EUR. J. HUM. GENET., (1997), vol. 5, pages 180 - 185 | - PUFFENBERGER E.G. ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 79, pages 1257 - 1266 | - ATTIE T. ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET, (1995), vol. 4, pages 2407 - 15 2409 | - AURICCHIO A. ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1996), vol. 5, pages 351 - 354 | - AMIEL J. ET AL., HUM. MOL.GENET., (1996), vol. 5, pages 355 - 357 | - HOFSTRA R.M.W. ET AL., NAT. GENET., (1996), vol. 12, pages 445 - 447 | - SVENSSON P.J. ET AL., HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 103, pages 145 - 148 | - FUCHS S. ET AL., MOL. MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 115 - 124 | - PINGAULT V. ET AL., HUM. GENET., (2002), vol. 111, pages 198 - 206 | - LAB. INVEST., (2002), vol. 82, no. 11, pages 1573 - 1582 | - XU, X.Z. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2001), vol. 98, no. 19, pages 10692 - 10697 | - CELL, (2002), vol. 109, no. 3, pages 397 - 407 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 33, pages 30813 - 30820 | - CICCODICOLA, A. ET AL., EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 1987 - 1991 | - AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1991), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 555 - 565 | - FUJISAKU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, no. 4, pages 2118 - 2125 | - WEIS J.J. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1988), vol. 167, pages 1047 - 1066 | - MOORE M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1987), vol. 84, pages 9194 - 9198 | - BAREL M. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 35, pages 1025 - 1031 | - WEIS J.J. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1986), vol. 83, pages 5639 - 5643 | - SINHA S.K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 5311 - 5320 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, no. 7, pages 4126 - 4131 | - BLOOD, (2002), vol. 100, no. 9, pages 3068 - 3076 | - MULLER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 1621 - 1625 | - GENOME RES., (2003), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 2265 - 2270 | - IMMUNOGENETICS, (2002), vol. 54, no. 2, pages 87 - 95 | - BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 2662 - 2669 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2001), vol. 98, no. 17, pages 9772 - 9777 | - XU, M.J. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2001), vol. 280, no. 3, pages 768 - 775 | - COUSSENS L. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, no. 4730, pages 1132 - 1139 | - YAMAMOTO T. ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, pages 230 - 234 | - SEMBA K. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1985), vol. 82, pages 6497 - 6501 | - SWIERCZ J.M. ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (2004), vol. 165, pages 869 - 15 880 | - KUHNS J.J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 36422 - 36427 | - CHO H.-S. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 421, pages 756 - 760 | - EHSANI A. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1993), vol. 15, pages 426 - 429 | - GAO J. ET AL., BMB REP, (20091031), vol. 42, no. 10, pages 636 - 41 | - LIU HQ. ET AL., XI BAO YU FEN ZI MIAN YI XUE ZA ZHI, (201005), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 456 - 8 | - BARNETT T. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1988), vol. 3, pages 59 - 66 | - TAWARAGI Y. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1988), vol. 150, pages 89 - 96 | - STRAUSBERG R.L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 16899 - 16903 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16899 - 16903 | - CLARK H.F. ET AL., GENOME RES., (2003), vol. 13, pages 2265 - 2270 | - MUNGALL A.J. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 805 - 811 | - BLUMBERG H. ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 104, pages 9 - 19 | - DUMOUTIER L. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., vol. 167, pages 3545 - 3549 | - PARRISH-NOVAK J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 47517 - 47523 | - PLETNEV S. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (20021210), vol. 42, pages 12617 - 12624 | - SHEIKH F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 172, pages 2006 - 2010 | - GARY S.C. ET AL., GENE, (2000), vol. 256, pages 139 - 147 | - CHAN,J.; WATT, V.M., ONCOGENE, (1991), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 1057 - 1061 | - ONCOGENE, (1995), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 897 - 905 | - ANNU. REV. NEUROSCI., (1998), vol. 21, pages 309 - 345 | - INT. REV. CYTOL., (2000), vol. 196, pages 177 - 244 | - REITER R.E. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1998), vol. 95, pages 1735 - 1740 | - GU Z. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2000), vol. 19, pages 1288 - 1296 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2000), vol. 275, no. 3, pages 783 - 788 | - THOMPSON, J.S. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 293, no. 5537, pages 2108 - 2111 | - WILSON ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 173, pages 137 - 146 | - STAMENKOVIC I. ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 345, no. 6270, pages 74 - 77 | - DIJOSEPH JF., CANCER IMMUNOL LMMUNOTHER, (200501), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 11 - 24 | - GOLDENBERG DM. ET AL., EXPERT REV ANTICANCER THER, (2006), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1341 - 53 | - HA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1526 - 1531 | - MÜLLER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 22, pages 1621 - 1625 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1994), vol. 40, no. 4, pages 287 - 295 | - PREUD'HOMME ET AL., CLIN. EXP. 5 IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 90, no. 1, pages 141 - 146 | - YU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, no. 2, pages 633 - 637 | - SAKAGUCHI ET AL., EMBO J., (1988), vol. 7, no. 11, pages 3457 - 3464 | - DOBNER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 22, pages 2795 - 2799 | - BARELLA ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1995), vol. 309, pages 773 - 779 | - TONNELLE ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 2839 - 2847 | - JONSSON ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1989), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 411 - 413 | - BECK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 228, pages 433 - 441 | - STRAUSBERG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 16899 - 16903 | - SERVENIUS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 8759 - 8766 | - BECK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 25, no. 255, pages 1 - 13 | - NARUSE ET AL., TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2002), vol. 59, pages 512 - 519 | - KASAHARA ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1989), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 66 - 68 | - LARHAMMAR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, no. 26, pages 14111 - 14119 | - LE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1997), vol. 418, no. 1-2, pages 195 - 199 | - TOUCHMAN ET AL., GENOME RES., (2000), vol. 10, pages 165 - 173 | - HOEGEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 144, no. 12, pages 4870 - 4877 | - MIURA ET AL., GENOMICS, (19951215), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 299 - 304 | - MIURA ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, pages 2815 - 2822 | - DAVIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (2001), vol. 98, no. 17, pages 9772 - 9777 | - NAKAYAMA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2000), vol. 277, no. 1, pages 124 - 127 | - HORIE ET AL., GENOMICS, (2000), vol. 67, pages 146 - 152 | - UCHIDA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1999), vol. 266, pages 593 - 602 | - LIANG ET AL., CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 4907 - 12 | - GLYNNE-JONES ET AL., INT J CANCER, (20011015), vol. 94, no. 2, pages 178 - 84 | - ISRAELI R.S. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 227 - 230 | - MOFFETT S. ET AL., HYBRIDOMA (LARCHMT)., (200712), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 363 - 72 | - WANG, S. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2001), vol. 92, pages 871 - 876 | - KATO, K. ET AL., INT. J. UROL., (2003), vol. 10, pages 439 - 444 | - WOLF P. ET AL., PROSTATE, (20100401), vol. 70, no. 5, pages 562 - 9 | - YAMADA Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, no. 1, pages 251 - 255 | - SUSINI C. ET AL., ANN ONCOL., (200612), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 1733 - 42 | - YAMADA,Y. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 195, no. 2, pages 844 - 852 | - SUZUKI S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1986), vol. 83, no. 22, pages 8614 - 8618 | - SHEPPARD D.J. ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, no. 20, pages 11502 - 11507 | - RYAN MC. ET AL., CANCER RES, (20120415), vol. 72, no. 8, page 4630 | - BEAUCHEMIN N. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 3221 - 3230 | - DEAN M. ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 318, no. 6044, pages 385 - 388 | - LU RM. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (201104), vol. 32, no. 12, pages 3265 - 74 | - PACCHIANA G. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20101112), vol. 285, no. 46, pages 36149 - 57 | - JIAO Y. ET AL., MOL BIOTECHNOL., (200509), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 41 - 54 | - GENDLER S.J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, no. 25, pages 15286 - 15293 | - SORENSEN AL. ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGYVOL, (2006), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 96 - 107 | - BURCHELL J. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 5476 - 5482 | - IVANOV PK. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL J, (200707), vol. 2, no. 7, pages 863 - 70 | - THIE H. ET AL., PLOS ONE, (20110114), vol. 6, no. 1, page E15921 | - PASTOREK J. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1994), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 2877 - 2888 | - PETRUL HM. ET AL., MOL CANCER THER, (201202), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 340 - 9 | - XU C. ET AL., PLOS ONE, (20100310), vol. 5, no. 3, page E9625 | - KENNETT RH. ET AL., CURR OPIN MOL THER, (200302), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 70 - 5 | - BATRA SK. ET AL., CELL GROWTH DIFFER, (1995), vol. 6, pages 1251 - 1259 | - WIKSTRAND CJ. ET AL., CANCER RES., (19950715), vol. 55, no. 14, pages 3140 - 8 | - WANG H. ET AL., FASEB J., (201201), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 73 - 80 | - GUPTA P. ET AL., BMC BIOTECHNOL., (20101007), vol. 10, page 72 | - OHMAN L. ET AL., TUMOUR BIOL., (200203), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 61 - 9 | - HAN DG. ET AL., NAN FANG YI KE DA XUE XUE BAO, (201001), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 25 - 9 | - SIMMONS D. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, no. 8, pages 2797 - 2800 | - RAZA A. ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA, (200908), vol. 50, no. 8, pages 1336 - 44 | - SUTHERLAND, D.R. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1981), vol. 78, no. 7, pages 4515 - 4519 | - SCHNEIDER,C. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1982), vol. 257, pages 8516 - 8522 | - HOOGENBOOM,H.R. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1990), vol. 144, pages 3211 - 3217 | - TEDDER TF. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, no. 2, pages 712 - 7 | - AI-KATIB AM. ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (20090615), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 4038 - 45 | - KÜGLER M. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL., (200903), vol. 22, no. 3, pages 135 - 47 | - KNAPPIK, A. ET AL., J MOL BIOL, (200002), vol. 296, no. 1, pages 57 - 86 | - HERBST R. ET AL., J PHARMACOL EXP THER., (201010), vol. 335, no. 1, pages 213 - 22 | - CARDARELLI PM. ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (201002), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 257 - 65 | - ZALEVSKY J. ET AL., BLOOD, (20090416), vol. 113, no. 16, pages 3735 - 43 | - LANG P. ET AL., BLOOD, (20040515), vol. 103, no. 10, pages 3982 - 5 | - ZHANG J. ET AL., J DRUG TARGET, (201011), vol. 18, no. 9, pages 675 - 8 | - KUZIEL W.A. ET AL., J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1990), vol. 94, no. 6, pages 27S - 32S | - RECH AJ. ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI., (200909), vol. 1174, pages 99 - 106 | - O'BRYAN J.P. ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, no. 10, pages 5016 - 5031 | - YE X. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (20100923), vol. 29, no. 38, pages 5254 - 64 | - DURKOP H. ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 421 - 427 | - LAABI Y. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, no. 7, pages 1147 - 1154 | - FRATTA E. ET AL., MOL ONCOL., (201104), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 164 - 82 | - LIM SH., AM J BLOOD RES., (2012), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 29 - 35 | - KUKOWSKA-LATALLO,J.F. ET AL., GENES DEV., (1990), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 1288 - 1303 | - TING J. ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 275 - 286 | - GOODWIN R.G. ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 447 - 456 | - OFLAZOGLU, E. ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (20081001), vol. 14, no. 19, pages 6171 - 80 | - JIN-HUA P. ET AL., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 412 - 415 | - DICKINSON D.P. ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1995), vol. 36, no. 10, pages 2020 - 2031 | - DE SAUVAGE F.J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, no. 27, pages 17912 - 17918 | - SINGH S. ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1991), vol. 179, no. 3, pages 1455 - 1463 | - TAYLOR KM. ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (20030401), vol. 1611, no. 1-2, pages 16 - 30 | - KING K.W., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1999), vol. 1445, no. 3, pages 257 - 270 | - DICKSON,G. ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 50, no. 7, pages 1119 - 1130 | - SMITH SV. ET AL., CURR OPIN MOL THER., (200508), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 394 - 401 | - ROGUSKA, M.A. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (199402), vol. 91, pages 969 - 973 | - HAGLUND C. ET AL., BR J CANCER, (1989), vol. 60, pages 845 - 851 | - BAECKSTROM D. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 21537 - 21547 | - TOLCHER AW ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (20030115), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 211 - 22 | - ELWOOD P.C. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, no. 25, pages 14893 - 14901 | - WHITEMAN KR. ET AL., CANCER RES, (20120415), vol. 72, no. 8, page 4628 | - WETERMAN M.A. ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1995), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 73 - 81 | - TSE KF. ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (20060215), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 1373 - 82 | - FEIGELSTOCK D. ET AL., J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 6621 - 6628 | - PARRY R. ET AL., CANCER RES., (20050915), vol. 65, no. 18, pages 8397 - 405 | - SICA GL. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (200306), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 849 - 61 | - PARK S.K., J. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 119, no. 2, pages 235 - 239 | - SCHWARTZ-ALBIEZ R. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 140, no. 3, pages 905 - 914 | - HEIDER KH. ET AL., BLOOD, (20111013), vol. 118, no. 15, pages 4159 - 68 | - ZHAO X. ET AL., BLOOD, (2007), vol. 110, pages 2569 - 2577 | - DECKERT J. ET AL., CANCER RES, (20120415), vol. 72, no. 8, page 4625 | - O'CONNELL FP. ET AL., AM J CLIN PATHOL., (200402), vol. 121, no. 2, pages 254 - 63 | - TASSONE P. ET AL., BLOOD, vol. 104, pages 3688 - 3696 | - KUDO,J. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, no. 24, pages 8827 - 8841 | - BERKOVA Z. ET AL., EXPERT OPIN INVESTIG DRUGS., (201001), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 141 - 9 | - OFFNER S. ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER, (200505), vol. 54, no. 5, pages 431 - 45 | - SUZUKI H. ET AL., ANN N YACAD SCI., (201207), vol. 1258, pages 65 - 70 | - DHOMEN NS. ET AL., CRIT REV ONCOG., (2012), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 3 - 50 | - BROADBRIDGE VT. ET AL., EXPERT REV ANTICANCER THER., (201205), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 555 - 65 | - ARGILES G. ET AL., FUTURE ONCOL., (201204), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 373 - 89 | - RIVERA F. ET AL., EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER., (200905), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 667 - 74 | - RAMAKRISHNAN MS. ET AL., MABS, (200901), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 41 - 8 | - PLOWMAN,G.D. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1990), vol. 87, no. 13, pages 4905 - 4909 | - SCHOEBERL B. ET AL., CANCER RES., (20100315), vol. 70, no. 6, pages 2485 - 2494 | - RONSIN C. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1993), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 1195 - 1202 | - STRAUSBERG RL. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16899 - 16903 | - LEE JW. ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (20100501), vol. 16, no. 9, pages 2562 - 2570 | - TEDDER T.F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 208 - 212 | - ABDULLA NE. ET AL., BIODRUGS, (20120401), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 71 - 82 | - NIGHTINGALE G. ET AL., ANN PHARMACOTHER, (201110), vol. 45, no. 10, pages 1248 - 55 | - GOLDENBERG DM. ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA, (201005), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 747 - 55 | - NIES D.E. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, no. 5, pages 2818 - 2823 | - SIRI A. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1991), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 525 - 531 | - LUKOWICZ T. ET AL., J NUCL MED., (200704), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 582 - 7 | - PEDRETTI M. ET AL., LUNG CANCER, (200904), vol. 64, no. 1, pages 28 - 33 | - SCANLAN,M.J., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1994), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 5657 - 5661 | - FEDI P. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, no. 27, pages 19465 - 19472 | - FULCINITI M. ET AL., BLOOD, (20090709), vol. 114, no. 2, pages 371 - 379 | - XIA M.Q. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 1677 - 1684 | - BENSON DM. ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL., (20120601), vol. 30, no. 16, pages 2013 - 2015 | - RIUS C. ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, no. 12, pages 4677 - 4690 | - WALLNER B.P., NATURE, (1986), vol. 320, no. 6057, pages 77 - 81 | - HESSION C. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, no. 11, pages 6682 - 6685 | - DENNIS ET AL., "Albumin Binding As A General Strategy For Improving The Pharmacokinetics Of Proteins", J BIOL CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 35035 - 35043 | - DENNIS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 35035 - 35043 | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - CROUCH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1993), vol. 160, pages 81 - 88 | - CREE ET AL., ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 398 - 404 | - ANGEW CHEM. INTL. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - M. ASH AND I. ASH, Handbook of Pharmaceutical Additives, 2nd ed., SYNAPSE INFORMATION RESOURCES, INC. | - GETZ ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 273, pages 73 - 80 | - SMITH, P.K. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 150, no. 1, pages 76 - 85 | US20050654125 |