EP2908277 - Device, method and non-transitory computer readable storage medium for performing instant message communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.08.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synology Incorporated 3F-3, No. 106, Chang An W. Rd. Taipei 103 / TW | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsiao, Ping-Che 5F No6 Aly 42 Ln 166 Dahu St Neighborhood 2 Xiuhu Vil Neihu Dist 114 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Liu, Jia-Yu No 145 Sec 1 Jiayuan Rd Shulin Dist 238 New Taipei City / TW | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Prugneau, Philippe Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Prugneau, Philippe Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 14191158.6 | 30.10.2014 | [2015/34] | Priority number, date | TW20140105317 | 18.02.2014 Original published format: TW 103105317 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908277 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, H04L12/58 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L51/48 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Verfahren und nichttransitorisches computerlesbares Speichermedium zur Durchführung einer Sofortnachrichtkommunikation | [2015/34] | English: | Device, method and non-transitory computer readable storage medium for performing instant message communication | [2015/34] | French: | Dispositif, procédé et support de stockage lisible par ordinateur non transitoire pour effectuer une communication de messagerie instantanée | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 16.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.07.2018 | 25.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/52] | 18.08.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004030750 (MOORE RICHARD G [US], et al) [I] 1,5-7,11,12 * figures 2-7 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0 58] - [0059] - [0 68] - [0069] - [0 74] - [0075] - [0 80] - [0082] * * paragraphs [0089] , [0 91] * * paragraphs [0125] - [0129] - [ 131] - [0141] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraphs [0150] - [0152] - [ 157] - [0163] * * paragraphs [0169] , [ 171] *; | [A]US2006075029 (KELSO SCOTT E [US], et al) [A] 4* the whole document *; | [I]US2006259555 (HASSOUNAH KHALED [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0 10] - [0011] - [0 12] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0018] , [0 27] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 32] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] *; | [I]US2013144961 (PARK EUIVIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-3,11,12 * figures 1, 4, 5, 19 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [00 9] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0035] , [0 36] , [0 40] , [0 46] , [0 47] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0061] * * paragraphs [0083] , [0 90] , [0 91] *; | [I] - SAINT-ANDRE CISCO P, "Extensible Messaging and Presence Protocol (XMPP): Instant Messaging and Presence; rfc6121.txt", EXTENSIBLE MESSAGING AND PRESENCE PROTOCOL (XMPP): INSTANT MESSAGING AND PRESENCE; RFC6121.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20110330), pages 1 - 114, XP015075940 [I] 1-3,11,12 * the whole document * | [I] - LEIGH GRIFFIN ET AL, "Scaling Instant Messaging communication services: A comparison of blocking and non-blocking techniques", COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS (ISCC), 2011 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20110628), doi:10.1109/ISCC.2011.5983895, ISBN 978-1-4577-0680-6, pages 550 - 557, XP032018449 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCC.2011.5983895 |