EP2874032 - Target signature closed loop control system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emhart Glass S.A. Hinterbergstrasse 22 6330 Cham / CH | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simon, Jonathan S. 168 Center Hill Road Pleasant Valley, CT Connecticut 06063 / US | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Ashton, Gareth Mark, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [2020/19] |
Former [2015/21] | Ashton, Gareth Mark, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 14191361.6 | 31.10.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | US201314074260 | 07.11.2013 Original published format: US201314074260 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2874032 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2874032 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2874032 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G01J5/00, G05B19/418, G06T7/00, G05B19/04 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B19/0405 (US);
G05B19/41875 (EP,US);
G06T7/001 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25391 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2635 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42036 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42058 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42307 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/21] | G05B19/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zielsignaturregelungssystem und -verfahren | [2015/21] | English: | Target signature closed loop control system and method | [2015/21] | French: | Système de commande en boucle fermée de signature cible et procédé | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Observations by third parties | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2019 | Observations by third parties | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2021
10.02.2021
ADMISSIBLE Bottero S.p.A. Via Genova, 82 12100 Cuneo / IT Opponent's representative Studio Torta S.p.A., et al, et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2023/41] |
Former [2021/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2021
10.02.2021
ADMISSIBLE Bottero S.p.A. Via Genova, 82 12100 Cuneo / IT Opponent's representative Lovino, Paolo, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 24.02.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2022 | 16.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.08.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 24.10.2022 | Appeal received No. T2343/22 | 24.10.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 27.12.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2014 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | IE | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | LU | 31.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.10.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
IE | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
LU | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
IE | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
LU | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
LU | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
LU | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
LU | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008013821 (MACGREGOR JOHN F [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0056] - [0074] *; | [A]US2012211331 (SIMON JONATHAN S [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0048] *; | [I]US2012226378 (SIMON JONATHAN S [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0054] * * claims 10,11 *; | [A]US2013178952 (WERSBORG INGO STORK GENANNT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1D ** paragraphs [0084] - [0122] * | by applicant | US6604386 | US6604385 | US6604384 | US6604383 | US6606886 | US6705120 | US6705119 | US6711916 | US6722158 | US7489983 | US2011141265 | EP2336740 | US8462203 | - PENROSE, ROGER, "A Generalized Inverse for Matrices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE CAMBRIDGE PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY, (1955), vol. 51, pages 406 - 413 | other | US2012226378 | DE102012002016 | Opposition | EP0873975 | US2008013821 | US2011141265 | US2012211331 | US2012226378 | US2013178952 | - Anonymous, "Hot imaging and cold inspection meet quality demands together", Glass, (20061100), pages 1 - 2, XP055778301 | - Anonymous, "I-CARE User Manual MSC Inspection worldwide", MSC, (20080000), pages 1 - 160, XP055778305 | - Anonymous, "Hot End Imaging", MSC, (20070608), page 1, URL: https://web.archive.orq/web/20070608115743, XP055778310 | - Anonymous, "L'imagerie en bout chaud : I-Care", Verre, (20041200), vol. 10, no. 6, pages 1 - 3, XP055778318 | - Anonymous, "Process control and flexibility", Glass Worldwide, (20120000), pages 1 - 3, XP055778361 | - Macgregor J. F., T.Kourti, J.Liu, J.Bradley, K.Dunnh.Yu2, "Multivariate methods for the analysis of ...", IFAC Proceedings Volumes, vol. 40, no. 11, (20070000), pages 193 - 198, URL: www.sciencedirect.com/journal/ifac-proceedings-volumes/vol/40/issue/11, XP055778393 | - C.Duchesnea, J.J.Liu, J.F.Macgregorcd, "Multivariate image analysis in the process industries: A review", Chemometrics and Intelligent Laboratory Systems, (20120416), pages 117 - 128, XP055778410 |