EP2871134 - Method and device for packaging ready meals in at least one bowl [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schrade, Karl-Wilhelm Weberstrasse 10 26340 Zetel / DE | [2015/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/20] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Matthias Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [2015/20] | Application number, filing date | 14191587.6 | 04.11.2014 | [2015/20] | Priority number, date | DE20131018629 | 06.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013018629 | [2015/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2871134 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2871134 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65B29/08, B65B7/28, B65D81/34, A23L3/3418, B65B25/22, B65D77/20, B65B7/16, A23L5/30 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
B65D81/3453 (EP,US);
A23L3/3418 (US);
A23L5/34 (EP,US);
B65B31/043 (US);
B65B7/164 (EP,US);
B65B7/168 (EP,US);
B65D77/2024 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
B65B25/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/20] | B65B29/08, B65B7/28, B65D81/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2015/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Fertignahrung in zumindest einer Schale | [2015/20] | English: | Method and device for packaging ready meals in at least one bowl | [2015/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de conditionnement de plat cuisiné dans au moins une coque | [2015/20] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 03.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2014 | AL | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | MT | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | IE | 04.11.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.11.2014 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.11.2014 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.11.2014 | |
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.11.2014 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
IE | 04.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 08.03.2017 | |
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE2610083 (KRUGMANN ALFRED R) [X] 4,5 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 1-3,7 [Y] 6; | [XA]US4870800 (KASAI RYUSUKE [JP]) [X] 4-6 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 9; figures 17-19 * [A] 1-3,7; | [XAY]GB2251541 (CAMPA UGO, et al) [X] 4,5 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 8; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-3,7 [Y] 6; | [A]EP0967160 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figures 1-3 * |