EP3018777 - Device and method for lifting a cable mounted on pylons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTE Réseau de Transport d'Electricité Tour Initiale 1 terrasse Bellini TSA 41000 92919 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lopez, Stéphane 51 Rue Frédéric Joliot Curie 13470 Carnoux-en-Provence / FR | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Bonnet, Michel Cabinet Bonnet 93, rue Réaumur - Boîte 10 75002 Paris / FR | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14192009.0 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018777 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3018777 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/04 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
H02G1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Entfernen eines auf Strommasten montierten Kabels | [2016/19] | English: | Device and method for lifting a cable mounted on pylons | [2016/19] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de levage d'un câble monté sur pylônes | [2016/19] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 08.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2014 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | MT | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | IE | 06.11.2017 | LU | 06.11.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
ES | 07.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
ES | 07.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MT | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 18.10.2017 | |
LT | 18.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014138496 (JONES THOMAS LEE [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0050] - [0060]; figures 1-23 * * abstract *; | [A]US6375163 (CARLSON DEREK [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]WO2013008234 (TUKACHINSKY ARIE LEIB [IL]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US4301994 (LINDSEY L E) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5941507 (PAGE DOUGLAS MONROE [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |