EP3018803 - Placement and replacement system and method for placing and replacing the electrical components of electromagnetic rotary machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oü, Goliath Wind Valge 13 11415 Tallinn / EE | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pabut, Ott Viu 3-6 13417 Tallinn / EE | 02 /
Zingg, Reto Vuti 36-1 10619 Tallinn / EE | 03 /
Kisseljov, Igor Keemia 19-132 10616 Tallinn / EE | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Sarap, Margus Jalaka 42-23 50109 Tartu / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Sarap, Margus Sarap & Partners Patent Agency Kompanii 1C 51004 Tartu / EE | Application number, filing date | 14192176.7 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018803 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/06, H02K15/03, H02K15/00, F03D1/00, // H02K7/18, H02K1/27, H02K3/47, H02K1/20, H02K1/32 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
H02K15/0006 (EP,US);
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
H02K1/278 (EP,US);
H02K15/03 (EP,US);
H02K15/061 (EP,US);
H02K3/47 (EP,US);
H02K7/1838 (EP,US);
F05B2220/7066 (EP,US);
F05B2230/60 (EP,US);
F05B2230/70 (EP,US);
H02K1/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Platzierungs- und Neuplatzierungssystem zur Platzierung und Neuplatzierung der elektrischen Komponenten einer elektromagnetischen drehenden Maschine | [2016/19] | English: | Placement and replacement system and method for placing and replacing the electrical components of electromagnetic rotary machine | [2016/19] | French: | Système et procédé de placement et de remplacement de composants électriques de machine rotative électromagnétique | [2016/19] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 30.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2016 | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011043065 (PIERCEY MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [YD]US2012073118 (BYWATERS GARRETT L [US], et al) [YD] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2012112466 (JUNGE MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [Y]WO2014151496 (NORTHERN POWER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | by applicant | US2012073118 |