EP2854313 - Dynamic channel quality measurement procedure for adaptive modulation and coding techniques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/51] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terry, Stephen 15 Summit Avenue Northport, NY New York NY 11768 / US | 02 /
Dick, Stephen G 61 Bobann Drive Nesconset, NY New York 11767 / US | 03 /
Miller, James M 18 Louisburg Square Verona, NY New York 07044 / US | 04 /
Zeira, Eldad 106 East Neck Road Huntington, NY New York 11743 / US | 05 /
Zeira, Ariela 106 East Neck Road New York, NY New York 11743 / US | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/34] |
Former [2015/14] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 14192732.7 | 15.04.2002 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | US20010290877 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: US 290877 | US20012956901 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 2956901 | [2021/18] |
Former [2015/14] | US20010290877 | 14.05.2001 | |
US20010290877P | 14.05.2001 | ||
US20010029569 | 21.12.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854313 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2854313 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2854313 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04L1/00, H04J3/06, H04W72/08, H04W72/12, H04B17/24, H04B17/309, H04B17/382 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
H04L1/0009 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B17/309 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/543 (US);
H04B17/24 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B17/382 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0027 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (KR);
H04W72/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/56 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/14] | Title | German: | Dynamisches Kanalqualitätsmessverfahren für adaptive Modulations- und Codierungstechniken | [2015/14] | English: | Dynamic channel quality measurement procedure for adaptive modulation and coding techniques | [2015/14] | French: | Procédure de mesure de la qualité d'un canal dynamique pour une modulation adaptative et des techniques de codage | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02725658.5 / EP1391126 | EP07105737.6 / EP1798877 | EP10181279.0 / EP2296299 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | IT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | GB | 15.04.2022 | IE | 15.04.2022 | [2023/08] |
Former [2022/36] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
IE | 15.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0755133 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-13 * abstract * * column 1, lines 8-10,43-55 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, line 38 - column 10, line 36; figure 6 * [Y] 8,14; | [Y]US5701294 (WARD TORBJORN [CA], et al) [Y] 8,14 * abstract *; | [A]WO0072496 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [Y]US6167031 (OLOFSSON HAAKAN GUNNAR [SE], et al) [Y] 8,14 * abstract * * column 4, lines 41-65 * |